There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Right to Try Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the use of unapproved medical products by patients diagnosed with a terminal illness in accordance with State law, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/06/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date All Actions
03/02/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/02/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/10/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/06/2017Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/06/2017Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/06/2017Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/06/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (89)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 02/06/2017
Rep. McSally, Martha [R-AZ-2]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Lewis, Jason [R-MN-2]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-16]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 02/14/2017
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 02/14/2017
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 02/14/2017
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 02/14/2017
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/16/2017
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 02/16/2017
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 02/16/2017
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 02/21/2017
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 02/21/2017
Rep. Arrington, Jodey C. [R-TX-19] 03/07/2017
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 03/13/2017
Rep. Faso, John J. [R-NY-19] 05/16/2017
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/06/2017
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/13/2017
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 07/12/2017
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 08/08/2017
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 10/12/2017
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 10/31/2017
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 11/29/2017
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 01/12/2018
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 01/12/2018
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 01/12/2018
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5] 01/12/2018
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 01/12/2018
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 01/12/2018
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 01/12/2018
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 01/16/2018
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 01/16/2018
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 02/02/2018
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 02/02/2018
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 02/02/2018
Rep. Tenney, Claudia [R-NY-22] 02/02/2018
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 02/02/2018
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 02/02/2018
Rep. Garrett, Thomas A., Jr. [R-VA-5] 02/02/2018
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 02/02/2018
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 02/02/2018
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 02/05/2018
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 02/06/2018
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 02/06/2018
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 02/06/2018
Rep. Higgins, Clay [R-LA-3] 02/06/2018
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8] 02/06/2018
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 02/06/2018
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4] 02/07/2018
Rep. Blum, Rod [R-IA-1] 02/07/2018
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 02/07/2018
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 02/07/2018
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1] 02/07/2018
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 02/07/2018
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 02/08/2018
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4] 02/14/2018
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 02/15/2018
Rep. Handel, Karen C. [R-GA-6] 02/16/2018
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 02/16/2018
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 02/20/2018
Rep. Comer, James [R-KY-1] 02/23/2018
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 02/23/2018
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 02/27/2018
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 03/05/2018
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 03/05/2018
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/21/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce02/06/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health02/10/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary02/06/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution and Civil Justice03/02/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations03/02/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.878. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/06/2017)

Right to Try Act of 2017

This bill requires the federal government to allow unrestricted manufacturing, distribution, prescribing, and dispensing of experimental drugs, biological products, and medical devices that are: (1) intended to treat a patient who has been diagnosed with a terminal illness, and (2) authorized by state law. The federal government must allow unrestricted possession and use of such treatments by patients certified by a physician as having exhausted all other treatment options.

A manufacturer, distributor, prescriber, dispenser, possessor, or user of such a treatment has no liability regarding the treatment.

The outcome of manufacture, distribution, prescribing, dispensing, possession, or use of such a treatment may not be used by a federal agency to adversely impact review or approval of the treatment.

The treatment must: (1) have successfully completed a phase 1 (initial, small scale) clinical trial; (2) remain under investigation in a clinical trial approved by the Food and Drug Administration; and (3) not be approved, licensed, or cleared for sale under the Federal Food, Drug, or Cosmetic Act or the Public Health Service Act.