There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

AMP Act
Allocation for Music Producers Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 17, United States Code, to provide for direct payment of statutory sound recording performance royalties to record producers, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/06/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
02/06/2017Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/06/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (67)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 02/06/2017
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/13/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/13/2017
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/13/2017
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 02/13/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 02/13/2017
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 02/13/2017
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 02/14/2017
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 02/14/2017
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/22/2017
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 04/06/2017
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 04/20/2017
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 04/26/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/04/2017
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/11/2017
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 05/19/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 05/24/2017
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 06/07/2017
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 06/22/2017
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 10/19/2017
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 10/24/2017
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 10/31/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 11/30/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 12/11/2017
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 12/18/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 12/18/2017
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3] 01/17/2018
Rep. Knight, Stephen [R-CA-25] 01/29/2018
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 02/05/2018
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 02/13/2018
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/13/2018
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 02/14/2018
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 02/14/2018
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4] 02/14/2018
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/16/2018
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 02/26/2018
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 02/26/2018
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/06/2018
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 03/06/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 03/15/2018
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21] 03/19/2018
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 03/22/2018
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 04/10/2018
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 04/11/2018
Rep. Blum, Rod [R-IA-1] 04/16/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary02/06/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.881. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/06/2017)

Allocation for Music Producers Act or the AMP Act

This bill amends federal copyright law to require a collective designated by the Copyright Royalty Judges to implement a policy providing for the acceptance of instructions (referred to as a "letter of direction") from a person who owns the exclusive right to publicly perform a sound recording by means of a digital audio transmission, or from a recording artist of a such a sound recording, to distribute a portion of royalty payments to a producer, mixer, or sound engineer who was part of the creative process behind the sound recording.

The collective must adopt special procedures for a producer, mixer, or sound engineer to receive a portion of royalties for recordings fixed before November 1, 1995, by certifying that a reasonable effort has been made to obtain a letter of direction from an artist who owns the right to receipts payable with respect to the sound recording.