Text: H.R.91 — 115th Congress (2017-2018)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Reported in House (06/28/2017)

Union Calendar No. 134

115th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. R. 91

[Report No. 115–197]


To amend title 38, United States Code, to make permanent the pilot program on counseling in retreat settings for women veterans newly separated from service in the Armed Forces.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

January 3, 2017

Ms. Brownley of California (for herself, Mr. Takano, and Ms. Kuster of New Hampshire) introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs

June 28, 2017

Additional sponsors: Mrs. Walorski, Mr. Higgins of Louisiana, Ms. Pingree, Ms. Rosen, Miss González-Colón of Puerto Rico, Mr. Correa, Mr. Costello of Pennsylvania, Mr. Sablan, Ms. Esty of Connecticut, Mr. Peters, Mr. Cleaver, and Mr. Pallone

June 28, 2017

Committed to the Committee of the Whole House on the State of the Union and ordered to be printed


A BILL

To amend title 38, United States Code, to make permanent the pilot program on counseling in retreat settings for women veterans newly separated from service in the Armed Forces.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Building Supportive Networks for Women Veterans Act”.

SEC. 2. Counseling in retreat settings for women veterans newly separated from service in the Armed Forces.

(a) Permanent program.—

(1) IN GENERAL.—Chapter 17 of title 38, United States Code, is amended by inserting after section 1712C the following new section:

§ 1712D. Counseling in retreat settings for women veterans newly separated

“(a) Program.— (1) Commencing on January 1, 2018, the Secretary shall carry out, through the Readjustment Counseling Service of the Veterans Health Administration, a program to provide reintegration and readjustment services described in subsection (b) in group retreat settings to women veterans who are recently separated from service in the Armed Forces after a prolonged deployment.

“(2) The participation of a veteran in the program under paragraph (1) shall be at the election of the veteran.

“(b) Covered services.—The services provided to a woman veteran under the program under subsection (a)(1) shall include the following:

“(1) Information on reintegration into the family, employment, and community of the veteran.

“(2) Financial counseling.

“(3) Occupational counseling.

“(4) Information and counseling on stress reduction.

“(5) Information and counseling on conflict resolution.

“(6) Such other information and counseling as the Secretary considers appropriate to assist the veteran in reintegration into the family, employment, and community of the veteran.

“(c) Biennial reports.—Not later than December 31, 2018, and each even-numbered year thereafter, the Secretary shall submit to the Committees on Veterans’ Affairs of the House of Representatives and the Senate a report on the program under subsection (a)(1).”.

(2) CLERICAL AMENDMENT.—The table of sections at the beginning of such chapter is amended by inserting after the item relating to section 1712C the following new item:


“1712D. Counseling in retreat settings for women veterans newly separated.”.

(b) Conforming repeal.—Effective December 31, 2017, section 203 of the Caregivers and Veterans Omnibus Health Services Act of 2010 (38 U.S.C. 1712A note) is repealed.


Union Calendar No. 134

115th CONGRESS
     1st Session
H. R. 91
[Report No. 115–197]

A BILL
To amend title 38, United States Code, to make permanent the pilot program on counseling in retreat settings for women veterans newly separated from service in the Armed Forces.

June 28, 2017
Committed to the Committee of the Whole House on the State of the Union and ordered to be printed