There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Saracini Aviation Safety Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Administrator of the Federal Aviation Administration to issue an order with respect to secondary cockpit barriers, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/07/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
02/08/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
02/07/2017Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/07/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (86)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 02/07/2017
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 02/07/2017
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Blum, Rod [R-IA-1]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 03/10/2017
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 03/10/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 03/10/2017
Rep. Bergman, Jack [R-MI-1] 03/10/2017
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 03/10/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/10/2017
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 03/10/2017
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3] 03/10/2017
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 03/15/2017
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 03/27/2017
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 04/04/2017
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 05/11/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 05/11/2017
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 05/11/2017
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 06/02/2017
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/02/2017
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 06/02/2017
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/06/2017
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 06/15/2017
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/15/2017
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 06/20/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 06/20/2017
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 06/21/2017
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/23/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 06/29/2017
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 07/11/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/11/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/11/2017
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 07/12/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/12/2017
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 07/17/2017
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/18/2017
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 07/19/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/19/2017
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 07/19/2017
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 07/19/2017
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 09/13/2017
Rep. Kihuen, Ruben J. [D-NV-4] 09/18/2017
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 09/18/2017
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 09/18/2017
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/18/2017
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 09/18/2017
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 01/19/2018
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 01/19/2018
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/26/2018
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 02/27/2018
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/05/2018
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 03/06/2018
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 03/06/2018
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 03/07/2018
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/07/2018
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/07/2018
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 03/09/2018
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 03/09/2018
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 03/09/2018
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/13/2018
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/13/2018
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/13/2018
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 03/13/2018
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 03/26/2018
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 04/10/2018
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 04/10/2018
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 04/10/2018
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 04/17/2018
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 04/23/2018
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 05/15/2018
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 06/12/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure02/07/2017 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Aviation02/08/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.911. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/07/2017)

Saracini Aviation Safety Act of 2017

This bill requires the Federal Aviation Administration to issue an order to require: (1) the installation of secondary barriers, other than the cockpit door, to prevent access to the flight deck of each covered aircraft; (2) such barriers on the aircraft with a cockpit door to remain locked while the aircraft is in flight and the cockpit door separating the flight deck and the passenger area is open; and (3) such barriers on the aircraft without a cockpit door to remain locked as determined by the pilot in command.

"Covered aircraft" is defined as a commercial aircraft: (1) equipped with more than 75 passenger seats, and (2) with a maximum gross takeoff weight of more than 75,000 pounds.