There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Fracturing Regulations are Effective in State Hands Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To clarify that a State has the sole authority to regulate hydraulic fracturing on Federal land within the boundaries of the State.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/07/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date
02/24/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
02/22/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/10/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/08/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
02/07/2017Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/07/2017Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/07/2017Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/07/2017Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/07/2017Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/07/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 02/16/2017

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources02/07/2017 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources02/22/2017 Referred to
House Agriculture02/07/2017 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry02/24/2017 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure02/07/2017 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment02/08/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce02/07/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Environment and the Economy02/10/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.928. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/07/2017)

Fracturing Regulations are Effective in State Hands Act

This bill gives states the sole authority to promulgate or enforce any regulation, guidance, or permit requirement regarding hydraulic fracturing on or under any land within their boundaries. Hydraulic fracturing or fracking is a process to extract underground resources such as oil or gas from a geologic formation by injecting water, a propping agent (e.g., sand), and chemical additives into a well under enough pressure to fracture the geological formation.

Hydraulic fracturing on federal land must comply with the law of the state in which the land is located.