There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Veterans' Access to Child Care Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Veterans' Access to Child Care Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans' Access to Child Care Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to provide child care assistance to veterans receiving certain medical services provided by the Department of Veterans Affairs.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
07/28/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6538)
07/28/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-266.
01/03/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/31/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
07/28/2017-11:07amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/28/2017-11:07amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6538)
07/28/2017-11:02amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 95.
07/28/2017-11:02amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6538-6539)
07/28/2017-11:02amHouseMr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/28/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 191.
07/28/2017HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-266.
07/19/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
07/19/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
04/06/2017HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health
03/29/2017HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health
01/19/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
01/03/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
01/03/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (15)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Veterans' Affairs01/03/2017 Referred to
07/19/2017 Markup by
07/28/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-266
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health01/19/2017 Referred to
03/29/2017 Hearings by
04/06/2017 Reported by
Senate Veterans' Affairs07/31/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.95.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.95. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (07/28/2017)

Veterans' Access to Child Care Act

(Sec. 2) This bill directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to provide child care assistance to an eligible veteran for any period that the veteran: (1) receives covered health care services at a VA facility, and (2) is required to travel to and return from such facility for the receipt of such services.

The bill defines: (1) "covered health care services" to mean regular mental health care services, intensive mental health care services, or such other intensive health care services to which the VA determines that provision of child care assistance would improve the veteran's access; and (2) "eligible veteran" as a veteran who is the primary caretaker of a child and who is receiving covered health care services from the VA or who is in need of, and who would receive, such services from the VA but for lack of child care.

Included among child care assistance to be provided under this bill are:

  • a stipend for the payment of the full cost of child care offered by a licensed child care center, which shall be modeled after the VA's Child Care Subsidy Program;
  • direct provision of child care at an on-site VA facility;
  • a payment made directly to a private child care agency; and
  • collaboration with a facility or program of another federal department or agency.

(Sec. 3) The bill extends through September 30, 2026, the $90 monthly limit on a VA pension paid to veterans residing in nursing homes when their nursing costs are paid through title XIX (Medicaid) of the Social Security Act.

(Sec. 4) The bill extends through December 31, 2024, VA authority to collect funding fees for certain VA, VA-guaranteed, or VA-insured housing loans.