There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Title VIII Nursing Workforce Reauthorization Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title VIII of the Public Health Service Act to extend advanced education nursing grants to support clinical nurse specialist programs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/07/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
07/12/2018Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/12/2018Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/27/2018Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
06/27/2018Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
02/10/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/07/2017Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/07/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (105)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/16/2017
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 02/16/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/01/2017
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/01/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 03/07/2017
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 03/07/2017
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/07/2017
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 03/08/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/08/2017
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 03/20/2017
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/20/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 03/23/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 03/29/2017
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 03/30/2017
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 03/30/2017
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 04/03/2017
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 04/03/2017
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 04/05/2017
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 04/05/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/24/2017
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/25/2017
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 04/28/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 05/16/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/16/2017
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/16/2017
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/25/2017
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 06/06/2017
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 06/07/2017
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/08/2017
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 06/08/2017
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/08/2017
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/08/2017
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/08/2017
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/12/2017
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 06/12/2017
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/12/2017
Rep. Faso, John J. [R-NY-19] 06/20/2017
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/20/2017
Rep. Russell, Steve [R-OK-5] 06/23/2017
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 06/28/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 06/29/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 07/11/2017
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 07/11/2017
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 07/11/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 07/14/2017
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 07/26/2017
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 07/26/2017
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 09/27/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/27/2017
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 09/28/2017
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/10/2017
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 10/12/2017
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 11/01/2017
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 11/07/2017
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 11/14/2017
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 11/29/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 11/29/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 01/18/2018
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 02/13/2018
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 02/13/2018
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 02/14/2018
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 02/14/2018
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/27/2018
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 03/05/2018
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 03/05/2018
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/05/2018
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 03/07/2018
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 03/13/2018
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 03/13/2018
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/20/2018
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 04/11/2018
Rep. Kihuen, Ruben J. [D-NV-4] 04/11/2018
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 04/17/2018
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 04/18/2018
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 04/24/2018
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 04/25/2018
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/25/2018
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 04/27/2018
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 04/27/2018
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 05/07/2018
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/08/2018
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 05/22/2018
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 06/05/2018
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/08/2018
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 06/14/2018
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 06/19/2018
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 06/19/2018
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 06/20/2018
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/25/2018
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/27/2018
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 07/10/2018
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large] 07/10/2018
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/10/2018
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/12/2018
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/12/2018
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 07/16/2018
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 07/16/2018
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/16/2018
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 07/16/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce02/07/2017 Referred to
07/12/2018 Markup by
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health02/10/2017 Referred to
06/27/2018 Markup by
06/27/2018 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.959. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/07/2017)

Title VIII Nursing Workforce Reauthorization Act of 2017

This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to extend through FY2022 support for nursing workforce programs and grants.

Eligibility for advanced nursing education grants is expanded to include education programs for clinical nurse leaders and all combined registered nurse and graduate degree programs. (Clinical nurse leaders are advanced generalist clinicians who apply research and coordinate care in order to improve outcomes for patients.) To be eligible for these grants, clinical nurse specialist programs must provide registered nurses with full-time clinical nurse specialist education that qualifies the nurses to provide a full range of care.

Programs for loan repayment and scholarships for nurses, loans for nursing faculty, and geriatric care education are extended through FY2022. Grants for increasing nursing workforce diversity are also extended through FY2022.

Nurse education, practice, and quality grants are extended through FY2022 and eligibility is expanded to include nurse-managed health clinics.

Grants for nursing career ladder programs are expanded to: (1) promote career advancement for individuals to become registered nurses or advanced education nurses; and (2) support internships and residency programs to encourage mentoring and the development of specialties.