There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Menstrual Equity For All Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To increase the availability and affordability of menstrual hygiene products for women and girls with limited access, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/07/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
03/02/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/07/2017Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, the Judiciary, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/07/2017Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, the Judiciary, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/07/2017Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, the Judiciary, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/07/2017Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, the Judiciary, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/07/2017Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, the Judiciary, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/07/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (42)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 02/07/2017
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 02/09/2017
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 02/13/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 03/02/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2] 03/02/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/02/2017
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 03/08/2017
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 03/08/2017
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 04/12/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 04/12/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 04/12/2017
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 04/27/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 05/04/2017
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/04/2017
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/04/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 05/04/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/11/2017
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 05/22/2017
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 05/22/2017
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/28/2017
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 11/02/2017
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/25/2018
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 02/06/2018
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 06/27/2018
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 07/17/2018

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means02/07/2017 Referred to
House Financial Services02/07/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary02/07/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations03/02/2017 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce02/07/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.972.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.972. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/07/2017)

Menstrual Equity For All Act of 2017

This bill establishes a tax credit, a tax exclusion, and requirements that apply to the purchase or distribution of menstrual hygiene products.

The bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to: (1) expand the tax exclusion for reimbursements from a health flexible spending arrangement to include amounts paid or incurred for menstrual hygiene products, and (2) allow a refundable tax credit of $120 for certain individuals who use menstrual hygiene products, subject to adjustments for inflation and a limitation based on adjusted gross income.

The bill amends the McKinney-Vento Homeless Assistance Act to require the Emergency Food and Shelter Program National Board to establish written guidelines for the Emergency Food and Shelter Program to ensure that funds provided under the program to private nonprofit organizations and local governments may be used to provide menstrual hygiene products.

Each state that receives a grant under the Edward Byrne Memorial Justice Assistance Grant Program must annually certify to the Department of Justice (DOJ) that all female inmates and detainees in that state have access to menstrual hygiene products on demand and at no cost to the inmates and detainees. If a state does not submit the required certification, DOJ must reduce the state's grant funding under the program by 20% and reallocate the funding to states that submitted certifications.

This bill also amends the Occupational Safety and Health Act of 1970 to require the Department of Labor to issue a rule requiring private employers with not less than 100 employees to provide free menstrual hygiene products for their employees.