There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Respect State Marijuana Laws Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Controlled Substances Act to provide for a new rule regarding the application of the Act to marihuana, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/07/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date All Actions
02/10/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/07/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/07/2017Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/07/2017Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/07/2017Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/07/2017Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H1075-1078)
Action By: House of Representatives
02/07/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (46)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/07/2017
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 02/16/2017
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/16/2017
Rep. Lewis, Jason [R-MN-2] 03/17/2017
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 03/17/2017
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 05/16/2017
Rep. Garrett, Thomas A., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/16/2017
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/22/2017
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 05/22/2017
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 06/21/2017
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/21/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 07/27/2017
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 07/27/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 01/08/2018
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 01/08/2018
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 01/08/2018
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/08/2018
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 01/08/2018
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 01/08/2018
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 01/08/2018
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3] 01/08/2018
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 01/08/2018
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 01/08/2018
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/08/2018
Rep. Blum, Rod [R-IA-1] 01/09/2018
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 01/09/2018
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 01/12/2018
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/12/2018
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 01/16/2018
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 01/22/2018
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1] 01/22/2018
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/02/2018
Rep. Kihuen, Ruben J. [D-NV-4] 02/02/2018
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 02/26/2018
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 06/05/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary02/07/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations02/07/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce02/07/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health02/10/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.975. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/07/2017)

Respect State Marijuana Laws Act of 2017

This bill amends the Controlled Substances Act to provide that the Act's regulatory controls and administrative, civil, and criminal penalties do not apply to a person who produces, possesses, distributes, dispenses, administers, or delivers marijuana in compliance with state laws.