There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Examining Opioid Treatment Infrastructure Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Comptroller General of the United States to evaluate and report on the in-patient and outpatient treatment capacity, availability, and needs of the United States.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/09/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
02/24/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/10/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/09/2017Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/09/2017Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/09/2017Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/09/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3]* 02/09/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 02/09/2017
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 02/09/2017
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 05/11/2017
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3] 03/29/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce02/09/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health02/10/2017 Referred to
House Natural Resources02/09/2017 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs02/24/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.994. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/09/2017)

Examining Opioid Treatment Infrastructure Act of 2017

This bill requires the Government Accountability Office to report on inpatient and outpatient treatment capacity, availability, and needs, including detoxification programs, clinical stabilization programs, transitional residential support services, rehabilitation programs, treatment programs for pregnant women or adolescents, and treatment through Indian health programs. The report must include the barriers to real-time reporting of drug overdoses at the federal, state, and local level and ways to overcome those barriers.