There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

21st Century Respect Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

21st Century Respect Act

Short Titles as Introduced

21st Century Respect Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

21st Century Respect Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To direct the Secretary of Agriculture and the Secretary of the Interior to modernize terms in certain regulations.

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Agriculture and the Secretary of the Interior to amend regulations for racial appropriateness.


Actions Overview (5)

Date Actions Overview
07/12/2018Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with amendments and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 115-300.
11/28/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H9448)
11/28/2017Committee on Agriculture discharged.
11/28/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-427, Part I.
02/09/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (24)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/12/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 513.
07/12/2018SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with amendments and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 115-300.
05/17/2018SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
02/07/2018SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 115-502.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining
11/29/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
11/28/2017-5:20pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
11/28/2017-5:20pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/28/2017-5:20pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9448)
11/28/2017-5:04pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 995.
11/28/2017-5:04pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9448-9449)
11/28/2017-5:04pmHouseMr. Tipton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
11/28/2017HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 104.
11/28/2017HouseCommittee on Agriculture discharged.
11/28/2017HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-427, Part I.
11/08/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
11/08/2017HouseSubcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs Discharged.
11/08/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
11/07/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/24/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/24/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
02/09/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
02/09/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
02/09/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
02/09/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/09/2017
Rep. Faso, John J. [R-NY-19] 05/24/2017
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 06/26/2017
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 08/01/2017

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources02/09/2017 Referred to
11/07/2017 Markup by
11/08/2017 Markup by
11/28/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-427
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs02/24/2017 Referred to
11/08/2017 Discharged from
House Agriculture02/09/2017 Referred to
11/28/2017 Discharged from
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit02/24/2017 Referred to
Senate Energy and Natural Resources11/29/2017 Referred to
05/17/2018 Markup by
07/12/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-300
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining02/07/2018 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for H.R.995.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.995. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (07/12/2018)

21st Century Respect Act

This bill requires the Department of Agriculture (USDA) and the General Services Administration to change the terminology used to describe the racial background or place of origin of people in regulations concerning: (1) USDA programs for financing and insuring loans for properties in rural areas, and (2) the 1974 development plan for Pennsylvania Avenue in Washington, DC.