Committees: H.R.995 — 115th Congress (2017-2018)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources02/09/2017 Referred to
11/07/2017 Markup by
11/08/2017 Markup by
11/28/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-427
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs02/24/2017 Referred to
11/08/2017 Discharged from
House Agriculture02/09/2017 Referred to
11/28/2017 Discharged from
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit02/24/2017 Referred to
Senate Energy and Natural Resources11/29/2017 Referred to
05/17/2018 Markup by
07/12/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-300
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining02/07/2018 Hearings by