There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

English Language Unity Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To declare English as the official language of the United States, to establish a uniform English language rule for naturalization, and to avoid misconstructions of the English language texts of the laws of the United States, pursuant to Congress' powers to provide for the general welfare of the United States and to establish a uniform rule of naturalization under article I, section 8, of the Constitution.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/09/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
03/02/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/09/2017Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/09/2017Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/09/2017Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/09/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (72)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 02/09/2017
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 02/09/2017
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 02/09/2017
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 02/09/2017
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 02/09/2017
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 02/13/2017
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/13/2017
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 02/15/2017
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 02/15/2017
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11] 02/15/2017
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 02/15/2017
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 02/21/2017
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/21/2017
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 02/24/2017
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 03/01/2017
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/01/2017
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/01/2017
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/08/2017
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 03/08/2017
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/08/2017
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 03/08/2017
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3] 03/08/2017
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/08/2017
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 03/08/2017
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 03/10/2017
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 03/10/2017
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 03/13/2017
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 03/13/2017
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 03/13/2017
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 03/20/2017
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/20/2017
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 03/20/2017
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 03/23/2017
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/05/2017
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/05/2017
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 04/25/2017
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 04/25/2017
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 04/26/2017
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 04/28/2017
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 05/08/2017
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/06/2017
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 06/06/2017
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 06/07/2017
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 06/20/2017
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 06/20/2017
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 06/20/2017
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 06/23/2017
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 06/26/2017
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 06/28/2017
Rep. Ferguson, A. Drew, IV [R-GA-3] 06/28/2017
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 07/11/2017
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/13/2017
Rep. Rooney, Francis [R-FL-19] 07/17/2017
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/25/2017
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 08/08/2017
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 08/29/2017
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 09/27/2017
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/28/2017
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 10/02/2017
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5] 10/19/2017
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 10/25/2017
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 10/25/2017
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 11/28/2017
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 01/08/2018
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 01/08/2018
Rep. Handel, Karen C. [R-GA-6] 01/29/2018
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 05/24/2018
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/24/2018
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/13/2018
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 07/23/2018
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 09/26/2018
Rep. Bergman, Jack [R-MI-1] 10/26/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce02/09/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary02/09/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security03/02/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.997. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/09/2017)

English Language Unity Act of 2017

This bill establishes English as the official language of the United States.

Naturalization ceremonies and official functions of the U.S. government, subject to exceptions, must be conducted in English.

The bill declares that all citizens should be able to read and understand generally the English language text of U.S. laws.

A person injured by a violation of this bill may obtain relief, including a declaratory judgment, in a civil action.

English language requirements and workplace policies, whether in the public or private sector, shall be presumptively consistent with U.S. laws. Any ambiguity in U.S. laws shall be resolved in accordance with the rights retained by the people and the powers reserved to states under the Bill of Rights.

The Department of Homeland Security shall issue a proposed rule for uniform testing of the English language ability of candidates for naturalization based upon the principles that: (1) all citizens should be able to read and understand generally the English language text of the Declaration of Independence, the Constitution, and the laws of the United States; and (2) any exceptions to this standard should be limited to extraordinary circumstances, such as asylum.