There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Authorizing Reverend Billy Graham to lie in honor in the rotunda of the Capitol.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
02/26/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Received in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S1222)
02/23/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection.(text: CR H1224)
02/23/2018Committee on House Administration discharged.
02/23/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date Chamber
02/27/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
02/26/2018SenateReceived in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1222)
02/23/2018-10:09amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/23/2018-10:09amHouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H1224)
02/23/2018-10:09amHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H1224)
02/23/2018HouseCommittee on House Administration discharged.
02/23/2018-10:08amHouseMr. Walker asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
02/23/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on House Administration.
02/23/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Administration02/23/2018 Referred to
02/23/2018 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.107.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.Con.Res.107. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (02/26/2018)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the House passed version is repeated here.)

(Sec. 1) Authorizes Reverend Billy Graham to lie in honor in the rotunda of the Capitol from February 28, 2018, to March 1, 2018.