There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Directing the President pursuant to section 5(c) of the War Powers Resolution to remove United States Armed Forces from hostilities in the Republic of Yemen that have not been authorized by Congress.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/26/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
09/26/2018Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/26/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (98)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 09/26/2018
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 09/26/2018
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 09/26/2018
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 09/26/2018
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 09/26/2018
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4]* 09/26/2018
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 09/26/2018
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 09/26/2018
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16]* 09/26/2018
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 09/26/2018
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 09/26/2018
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 09/26/2018
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 09/26/2018
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 09/26/2018
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 09/26/2018
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 09/26/2018
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 09/26/2018
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 09/26/2018
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 09/26/2018
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 09/26/2018
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 09/26/2018
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 09/26/2018
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 09/26/2018
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 09/26/2018
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 09/26/2018
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17]* 09/26/2018
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/27/2018
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 09/27/2018
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 09/27/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/27/2018
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 09/28/2018
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 09/28/2018
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 09/28/2018
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 10/05/2018
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 10/05/2018
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1] 10/05/2018
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 10/05/2018
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 10/05/2018
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 10/05/2018
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 10/05/2018
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 10/05/2018
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 10/12/2018
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 10/12/2018
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 10/12/2018
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/12/2018
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 10/12/2018
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/12/2018
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 10/12/2018
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 10/12/2018
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/16/2018
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 10/16/2018
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 10/19/2018
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 10/19/2018
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 10/19/2018
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4] 10/19/2018
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 10/19/2018
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 10/23/2018
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 10/23/2018
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 10/23/2018
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/23/2018
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 10/26/2018
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 10/26/2018
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 10/26/2018
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 10/26/2018
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 10/26/2018
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/30/2018
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 10/30/2018
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 10/30/2018
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/30/2018
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 11/02/2018
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 11/02/2018
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 11/02/2018
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 11/02/2018
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/02/2018
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 11/02/2018
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/02/2018
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 11/02/2018
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 11/13/2018
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 11/13/2018
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 11/13/2018
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 11/13/2018
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/15/2018
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21] 11/15/2018
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 11/15/2018
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 11/15/2018
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 11/15/2018
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 11/15/2018
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 11/20/2018
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 11/20/2018
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-12] 11/23/2018
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/27/2018
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 11/27/2018
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 11/27/2018
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 12/03/2018
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 12/03/2018
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 12/03/2018
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 12/10/2018
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 12/11/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs09/26/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Con.Res.138. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/26/2018)

Directs the President to remove U.S. Armed Forces from hostilities in Yemen, except for Armed Forces engaged in operations authorized under the 2001 Authorization for Use of Military Force, within 30 days unless and until a declaration of war or specific authorization for such use has been enacted into law.