There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Permitting the use of the rotunda of the Capitol for a ceremony as part of the commemoration of the days of remembrance of victims of the Holocaust.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
02/10/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S1092-1093)
02/06/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection.(text: CR H994)
02/06/2017Committee on House Administration discharged.
02/01/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber
02/13/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
02/10/2017SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1092-1093)
02/07/2017SenateReceived in the Senate.
02/06/2017-7:01pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/06/2017-7:01pmHouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H994)
02/06/2017-7:01pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H994)
02/06/2017HouseCommittee on House Administration discharged.
02/06/2017-7:00pmHouseMr. Harper asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
02/01/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on House Administration.
02/01/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 02/01/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Administration02/01/2017 Referred to
02/06/2017 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.18.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.Con.Res.18. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (02/10/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Authorizes the use of the Capitol rotunda on April 25, 2017, for a ceremony as part of the commemoration of the days of remembrance of victims of the Holocaust.