There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Reaffirming a strong commitment to the United States-Australia alliance relationship.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/06/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
02/16/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia and the Pacific.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
02/06/2017Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/06/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (34)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/06/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 02/09/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 02/13/2017
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 11/21/2017
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 05/11/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs02/06/2017 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Asia and the Pacific02/16/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Con.Res.21. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/06/2017)

Reaffirms: (1) the strong alliance between Australia and the United States, and (2) the importance of a U.S.-Australia relationship based on mutual respect and befitting a close and longstanding alliance partner crucial to the preservation of U.S. national interests in the Indo-Asia Pacific region and around the world.

Expresses support for continued diplomatic, military, and economic cooperation with Australia.