There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Providing for a joint session of Congress to receive a message from the President.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
02/17/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S1415-1416)
02/14/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection.(text: CR H1160)
02/14/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date Chamber
02/17/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
02/17/2017SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1415-1416)
02/15/2017SenateReceived in the Senate.
02/14/2017-4:41pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/14/2017-4:41pmHouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H1160)
02/14/2017-4:41pmHouseConsidered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H1160)
02/14/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (0)

As of 01/25/2020 text has not been received for H.Con.Res.23 - Providing for a joint session of Congress to receive a message from the President.

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.23.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.Con.Res.23. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (02/17/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Provides for a joint session of Congress on February 28, 2017, to receive a message from the President.