There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Establishing a Joint Committee on the Organization of Congress.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/16/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
02/16/2017Referred to the House Committee on Rules.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/16/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (67)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 02/16/2017
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Graves, Garret [R-LA-6]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Bergman, Jack [R-MI-1]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8]* 02/16/2017
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-16]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 02/27/2017
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 03/09/2017
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 03/09/2017
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/20/2017
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/20/2017
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 03/27/2017
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 06/06/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 06/06/2017
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/20/2017
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/29/2017
Rep. Davidson, Warren [R-OH-8] 07/19/2017
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 07/19/2017
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 07/19/2017
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 07/19/2017
Rep. Faso, John J. [R-NY-19] 07/25/2017
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4] 08/08/2017
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11] 09/07/2017
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 12/13/2017
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 12/13/2017
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 12/13/2017
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 04/11/2018
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 07/13/2018
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 09/04/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Rules02/16/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.28.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Con.Res.28. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/16/2017)

Establishes an ad hoc Joint Committee on the Organization of the Congress to study the organization, operations, functions, and relevant interactions of the Members of Congress and to make recommendations to:

  • make such operations and organization more effective and efficient;
  • make Congress and its Members more accountable; and
  • improve the orderly, timely, and effective consideration and disposal of legislation; and
  • improve the relationships between the Houses of Congress, with and among other branches of government, among elected Members and their staffs, and between Members and the citizens.

The committee shall also study the role and effectiveness of the standing, select, and special committees in addressing legislative responsibilities, particularly the authorization of federal programs and agencies and the future fiscal impact of entitlement programs.

Requires the committee to include in its report to both chambers at the end of a congressional session recommendations for its continuation or for designation of a similar entity to continue the pursuit of improvements in the congressional process.