There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Providing official recognition of the massacre of 11 African-American soldiers of the 333rd Field Artillery Battalion of the United States Army who had been captured in Wereth, Belgium, during the Battle of the Bulge on December 17, 1944.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
11/01/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection.(text: CR H8362)
11/01/2017Committee on Armed Services discharged.
04/04/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date Chamber
11/02/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
11/01/2017-6:27pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/01/2017-6:27pmHouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H8362)
11/01/2017-6:27pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H8362)
11/01/2017HouseCommittee on Armed Services discharged.
11/01/2017-6:27pmHouseMr. Scott, Austin asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
04/12/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
04/04/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
04/04/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services04/04/2017 Referred to
11/01/2017 Discharged from
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel04/12/2017 Referred to
Senate Armed Services11/02/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Con.Res.43. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (11/01/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Recognizes the dedicated service and ultimate sacrifice on behalf of the United States of the 11 African-American soldiers of the 333rd Field Artillery Battalion of the U.S. Army who were massacred in Wereth, Belgium, during the Battle of the Bulge on December 17, 1944.

Calls on the Senate Armed Services Committee to correct the omission of such massacre in the 1949 report of its subcommittee and appropriately recognize the Wereth 11.