There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Recognizing the 75th anniversary of Marine Corps Base Camp Pendleton.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/22/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
06/16/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
05/22/2017Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/22/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (62)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50]* 05/22/2017
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 05/22/2017
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 05/22/2017
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 05/22/2017
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/22/2017
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 05/22/2017
Rep. Knight, Stephen [R-CA-25]* 05/22/2017
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 05/22/2017
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1]* 05/22/2017
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 05/22/2017
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8]* 05/22/2017
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42]* 05/22/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 05/22/2017
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 05/22/2017
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9]* 05/22/2017
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 05/22/2017
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 05/22/2017
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 05/22/2017
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 05/22/2017
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 05/22/2017
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 05/22/2017
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12]* 05/22/2017
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 05/22/2017
Rep. Walters, Mimi [R-CA-45]* 05/22/2017
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2]* 05/22/2017
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 05/22/2017
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46]* 05/22/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 05/22/2017
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3]* 05/22/2017
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/20/2017
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 06/21/2017
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 06/21/2017
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 06/27/2017
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 06/27/2017
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-23] 07/06/2017
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 07/06/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 07/12/2017
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 07/12/2017
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 07/12/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 07/13/2017
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 07/13/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 07/13/2017
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5] 07/14/2017
Rep. Radewagen, Aumua Amata Coleman [R-AS-At Large] 07/14/2017
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 07/14/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 07/19/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 07/19/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 07/25/2017
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 07/25/2017
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 07/25/2017
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/27/2017
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 09/08/2017
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 10/11/2017
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/23/2017
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 10/24/2017
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large] 11/01/2017
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 11/02/2017
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 11/03/2017
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 11/07/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/29/2017
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 01/03/2018
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 01/30/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services05/22/2017 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel06/16/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.59.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Con.Res.59. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/22/2017)

Commemorates the service, dedication, and sacrifice of our armed service members and their families who served at Marine Corps Base Camp Pendleton on its 75th anniversary.

Recognizes the fighting force of the I Marine Expeditionary Force, 1st Marine Division, 1st Marine Logistics Group, Marine Corps Installation-West, 1st Marine Raider Battalion, Wounded Warriors Battalion-West, Marine Corps Air Station at Munn Field, Marine Aircraft Group 39, Marine Corps Tactical Systems Support Activity, Marine Corps Recruit Depot San Diego's Weapons & Field Training Battalion, Marine Corps School of Infantry-West, Marine Corps and Army Reserve Forces, the Navy's Assault Craft Unit 5, Naval Hospital Camp Pendleton, and 1st Dental Battalion.

Commends the members of the Armed Forces who deployed from Camp Pendleton to fight in World War II and the Korean, Vietnam, Kuwait, Iraq, and Afghanistan wars.