There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Recognizing and commending the leadership, patriotism, and contributions of veterans service organizations and volunteers involved for their commitment and sacrifice to ensure veterans are laid to rest with the honor and ceremony they earned through selfless service to the people of the United States in the Armed Forces.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/20/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
07/20/2017Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/20/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (38)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 07/20/2017
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 07/20/2017
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 07/20/2017
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22]* 07/20/2017
Rep. Walters, Mimi [R-CA-45]* 07/20/2017
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 07/20/2017
Rep. Knight, Stephen [R-CA-25]* 07/20/2017
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48]* 07/20/2017
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 07/20/2017
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2]* 07/20/2017
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 07/20/2017
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 07/20/2017
Rep. Tenney, Claudia [R-NY-22]* 07/20/2017
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 07/20/2017
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4]* 07/20/2017
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50]* 07/20/2017
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 07/20/2017
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46]* 07/20/2017
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 07/20/2017
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 07/20/2017
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27]* 07/20/2017
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21]* 07/20/2017
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 07/20/2017
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 07/20/2017
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18]* 07/20/2017
Rep. Poliquin, Bruce [R-ME-2]* 07/20/2017
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2]* 07/20/2017
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 07/20/2017
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 07/20/2017
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36]* 07/20/2017
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 07/20/2017
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9]* 07/20/2017
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 07/20/2017
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 07/20/2017
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/24/2017
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 07/25/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 03/19/2018
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 11/14/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs07/20/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Con.Res.70. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/20/2017)

Honors the patriotism of, and contributions to the United States by, generations of veterans service organizations.

Commends members of such organizations for their dedicated service to, and support of, members of the Armed Forces.

Calls on the people of the United States to follow the example of such organizations by volunteering support and services to those who have served this country.