There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection relating to "Arbitration Agreements".


Actions Overview (6)

Date Actions Overview
11/01/2017Became Public Law No: 115-74. (TXT | PDF)
11/01/2017Signed by President.
10/25/2017Presented to President.
10/24/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 51 - 50. Record Vote Number: 249.
07/25/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 231 - 190 (Roll no. 412).(text: CR H6269)
07/20/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/01/2017Became Public Law No: 115-74. (TXT | PDF)
11/01/2017Signed by President.
10/25/2017HousePresented to President.
10/25/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/24/2017SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 51 - 50. Record Vote Number: 249.
10/24/2017SenateMeasure laid before Senate by motion. (consideration: CR S6738-6760)
10/24/2017SenateMotion to proceed to consideration of measure agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S6738)
07/25/2017SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
07/25/2017-5:07pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/25/2017-5:07pmHouseOn passage Passed by recorded vote: 231 - 190 (Roll no. 412). (text: CR H6269)
07/25/2017-4:42pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
07/25/2017-3:25pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.J. Res. 111.
07/25/2017-3:24pmHouseRule provides for consideration of H.J. Res. 111 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments.
07/25/2017-3:24pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 468. (consideration: CR H6268-6278)
07/25/2017-1:38pmHouseRule H. Res. 468 passed House.
07/24/2017-6:45pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 468 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.J. Res. 111 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments.
07/20/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
07/20/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (34)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services07/20/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.J.Res.111. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-74 (11/01/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

This joint resolution nullifies a rule submitted by the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau (CFPB) regarding arbitration agreements.

(The rule regulates the use of arbitration agreements in contracts for specific consumer financial products and services. It prohibits the use of a predispute arbitration agreement to prevent a consumer from filing or participating in certain class action suits. The rule also requires consumer financial product and service providers to furnish the CFPB with particular information regarding arbitrations.)