There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection relating to "Payday, Vehicle Title, and Certain High-Cost Installment Loans".


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
12/01/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
12/01/2017Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/01/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (44)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 12/01/2017
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14]* 12/01/2017
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 12/01/2017
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 12/01/2017
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 12/01/2017
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 02/07/2018
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5] 02/07/2018
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6] 02/07/2018
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/07/2018
Rep. Faso, John J. [R-NY-19] 02/07/2018
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 02/07/2018
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 02/07/2018
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 02/07/2018
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 02/07/2018
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 02/07/2018
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11] 02/07/2018
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 02/07/2018
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/07/2018
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5] 02/07/2018
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 02/07/2018
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 02/16/2018
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 02/16/2018
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 02/16/2018
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 02/16/2018
Rep. Kustoff, David [R-TN-8] 02/16/2018
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 02/16/2018
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 02/27/2018
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 02/27/2018
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 02/27/2018
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 02/27/2018
Rep. Hollingsworth, Trey [R-IN-9] 02/27/2018
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 02/27/2018
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 03/08/2018
Rep. Davidson, Warren [R-OH-8] 03/08/2018
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 03/20/2018
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3] 03/20/2018
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 04/10/2018
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 04/10/2018
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 04/10/2018
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 04/13/2018
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 04/13/2018
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/03/2018
Rep. Rooney, Francis [R-FL-19] 05/03/2018
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 05/03/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services12/01/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.J.Res.122. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/01/2017)

This joint resolution nullifies the rule finalized by the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau on November 17, 2017, regarding payday, vehicle title, and other high-cost installment loans.