There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted for portions of this bill
  • Further Continuing Appropriations Act, 2018

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House for portions of this bill
  • Further Continuing Appropriations Act, 2018
Short Titles as Introduced for portions of this bill
  • Further Continuing Appropriations Act, 2018

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate for portions of this bill
  • Further Continuing Appropriations Act, 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Making further continuing appropriations for fiscal year 2018, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (6)

Date Actions Overview
12/08/2017Became Public Law No: 115-90. (TXT | PDF)
12/08/2017Signed by President.
12/08/2017Presented to President.
12/07/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Received in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 81 - 14. Record Vote Number: 311.(consideration: CR S7923-7925)
12/07/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 235 - 193 (Roll no. 670).(text: CR H9732)
12/04/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/08/2017Became Public Law No: 115-90. (TXT | PDF)
12/08/2017Signed by President.
12/08/2017HousePresented to President.
12/07/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/07/2017SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 81 - 14. Record Vote Number: 311. (consideration: CR S7923-7925)
12/07/2017-4:48pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/07/2017-4:48pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 235 - 193 (Roll no. 670). (text: CR H9732)
12/07/2017-4:41pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9743)
12/07/2017-3:20pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.J. Res. 123, the Chair put the question on passage of the bill, and announced by voice vote that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Frelinghuysen demanded the yeas and nays, and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of passage until later in the legislative day.
12/07/2017-3:19pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
12/07/2017-2:28pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.J. Res. 123.
12/07/2017-2:27pmHouseProvides for consideration of H.R. 477 and H.R. 3971 under structured rules with one hour of debate, one motion to recommit with or without instructions on each measure. Also provides for consideration of H.J.Res. 123 under a closed rule, with one hour of debate and one motion
12/07/2017-2:27pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 647. (consideration: CR H9732-9739)
12/07/2017-2:12pmHouseRule H. Res. 647 passed House.
12/06/2017-4:57pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 647 Reported to House. Provides for consideration of H.R. 477 and H.R. 3971 under structured rules with one hour of debate, one motion to recommit with or without instructions on each measure. Also provides for consideration of H.J.Res. 123 under a closed rule, with one hour of debate and one motion
12/04/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
12/04/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Appropriations12/04/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.J.Res.123. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-90 (12/08/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on December 7, 2017. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

DIVISION A--FURTHER CONTINUING APPROPRIATIONS ACT, 2018

Further Continuing Appropriations Act, 2018

(Sec. 101) This division amends the Continuing Appropriations Act, 2018 to extend the expiration date of the FY2018 Continuing Resolution (CR) from December 8, 2017, to December 22, 2017. The division provides continuing appropriations for federal agencies through the earlier of December 22, 2017, or the enactment of the applicable appropriations legislation. It prevents a government shutdown that would otherwise occur when the existing CR expires because none of the 12 FY2018 regular appropriations bills that fund the federal government have been enacted.

DIVISION B--CHILDREN'S HEALTH INSURANCE PROGRAM (CHIP) ALLOCATION REDISTRIBUTION SPECIAL RULE

(Sec. 201) This division amends title XXI (Children's Health Insurance Program [CHIP]) of the Social Security Act to establish a special rule, with respect to the first quarter of FY2018, for the redistribution of unused CHIP allotments to state child health plans experiencing emergency shortfalls. Specifically, the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services (CMS) must redistribute unused allotments to each such state in an amount equal to the state's emergency shortfall before the CMS may redistribute the allotments to any state that is experiencing a nonemergency shortfall.