There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Making further continuing appropriations for fiscal year 2019, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
12/07/2018Became Public Law No: 115-298.
12/07/2018Signed by President.
12/06/2018Presented to President.
12/06/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Received in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S7337)
12/06/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H9765)
12/06/2018Committee on Appropriations discharged.
12/03/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
12/07/2018Became Public Law No: 115-298.
12/07/2018Signed by President.
12/06/2018HousePresented to President.
12/06/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/06/2018SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S7337)
12/06/2018-12:02pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/06/2018-12:02pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H9765)
12/06/2018-12:01pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H9765)
12/06/2018HouseCommittee on Appropriations discharged.
12/06/2018-12:01pmHouseMr. Frelinghuysen asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
12/03/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
12/03/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Appropriations12/03/2018 Referred to
12/06/2018 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.J.Res.143.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.J.Res.143. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-298 (12/07/2018)

This joint resolution amends the Continuing Appropriations Act, 2019 to provide continuing FY2019 appropriations to several federal agencies through December 21, 2018 (December 7, 2018, under current law).

The resolution is known as a continuing resolution (CR) and prevents a partial government shutdown that would otherwise occur when the existing CR expires if any of the 7 remaining FY2019 appropriations bills have not been enacted.

(Five of the FY2019 appropriations bills were enacted earlier this year, including:

  • the Department of Defense Appropriations Act, 2019;
  • the Energy and Water Development and Related Agencies Appropriations Act, 2019;
  • the Departments of Labor, Health and Human Services, and Education, and Related Agencies Appropriations Act, 2019;
  • the Legislative Branch Appropriations Act, 2019; and
  • the Military Construction, Veterans Affairs, and Related Agencies Appropriations Act, 2019.)

The resolution extends the National Flood Insurance Program through December 21, 2018. It also has the effect of extending through December 21, 2018, several additional authorities and programs that were extended in the existing CR, including the Violence Against Women Reauthorization Act of 2013 and the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families (TANF) block grant.