There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the United States relating to contributions and expenditures intended to affect elections.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/24/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
02/06/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/24/2017Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/24/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (140)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/24/2017
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/24/2017
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Kihuen, Ruben J. [D-NV-4]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 01/24/2017
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/24/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/24/2017
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-12]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 01/27/2017
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 02/03/2017
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 02/13/2017
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 02/24/2017
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 02/28/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 02/28/2017
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 02/28/2017
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3] 02/28/2017
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/28/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 02/28/2017
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/28/2017
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 02/28/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 03/02/2017
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 03/06/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 03/10/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 03/16/2017
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 04/08/2017
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 04/25/2017
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 04/25/2017
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 04/25/2017
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 04/25/2017
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 05/08/2017
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/07/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/15/2017
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 06/15/2017
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 06/15/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/21/2017
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 06/21/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/21/2017
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 06/21/2017
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 06/21/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/26/2017
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/29/2017
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 07/03/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2] 07/27/2017
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 07/28/2017
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 09/13/2017
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 10/03/2017
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 11/16/2017
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 11/16/2017
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 11/16/2017
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 11/16/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 02/06/2018
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/06/2018
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 02/23/2018
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 03/05/2018
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 03/14/2018
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 04/24/2018
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 05/03/2018
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 05/21/2018
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 06/26/2018
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-18] 07/06/2018
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/23/2018
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 07/23/2018
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/23/2018
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 07/24/2018
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 08/17/2018
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/06/2018
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/13/2018
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 10/23/2018
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 12/12/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/24/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution and Civil Justice02/06/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.J.Res.31. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/24/2017)

Constitutional Amendment

This joint resolution proposes a constitutional amendment authorizing Congress and the states to set reasonable limits on the raising and spending of money by candidates and others to influence elections.

The amendment grants Congress and the states the power to implement and enforce this amendment by appropriate legislation. They are allowed to distinguish between natural persons and corporations or other artificial entities created by law, including by prohibiting such entities from spending money to influence elections.

This joint resolution declares that nothing in this amendment shall be construed to grant Congress or the states the power to abridge the freedom of the press.