There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Jump to: Summary | Actions Overview | All Actions | Titles | Subjects | Cosponsors | Committees | Related Bills

Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.J.Res.33. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/24/2017)

Constitutional Amendment

This joint resolution proposes a constitutional amendment declaring that women shall have equal rights in the United States and every place subject to its jurisdiction. 

The amendment prohibits the United States or any state from denying or abridging equal rights under the law on account of sex.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/24/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
02/06/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Action By: House Judiciary
01/24/2017 Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/24/2017 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Titles (1)

Official Titles:

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced:

Proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the United States relative to equal rights for men and women.


Subjects (5)

  • Constitution and constitutional amendments
  • Due process and equal protection
  • Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
  • Women's rights

Cosponsors (104)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 01/24/2017
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 01/24/2017
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 01/24/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 01/24/2017
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 02/03/2017
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 02/03/2017
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 02/03/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/03/2017
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 02/03/2017
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 02/03/2017
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/03/2017
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/03/2017
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/03/2017
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1] 02/03/2017
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 02/03/2017
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/14/2017
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 02/14/2017
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 03/17/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 03/17/2017
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 04/03/2017
Rep. Plaskett, Stacey E. [D-VI-At Large] 04/25/2017
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 04/28/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 06/20/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/24/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution and Civil Justice02/06/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.