There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Disapproving the rule submitted by the Department of Defense, the General Services Administration, and the National Aeronautics and Space Administration relating to the Federal Acquisition Regulation.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
03/27/2017 Became Public Law No: 115-11. (TXT | PDF)
03/27/2017 Signed by President.
03/16/2017 Presented to President.
03/06/2017 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 49 - 48. Record Vote Number: 81.
02/02/2017 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 236 - 187 (Roll no. 76).(text: CR H907)
01/30/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber
03/27/2017 Became Public Law No: 115-11. (TXT | PDF)
03/27/2017 Signed by President.
03/16/2017 House Presented to President.
03/07/2017 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
03/06/2017 Senate Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 49 - 48. Record Vote Number: 81.
03/06/2017 Senate Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S1591-1601)
03/02/2017 Senate Measure laid before Senate by motion.
03/02/2017 Senate Motion to proceed to consideration of measure agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 51 - 46. Record Vote Number: 80. (consideration: CR S1564-1571)
02/02/2017 Senate Received in the Senate, read twice.
02/02/2017-3:56pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/02/2017-3:56pm House On passage Passed by recorded vote: 236 - 187 (Roll no. 76). (text: CR H907)
02/02/2017-3:32pm House The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H915-916)
02/02/2017-2:39pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.J. Res. 37.
02/02/2017-2:39pm House Both resolutions are closed to amendments. Both resolutions provides for one hour of general debate, and provide for one motion to recommit.
02/02/2017-2:39pm House Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 74. (consideration: CR H907-916)
02/02/2017-1:37pm House Rule H. Res. 74 passed House.
01/31/2017-5:33pm House Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 74 Reported to House. Both resolutions are closed to amendments. Both resolutions provides for one hour of general debate, and provide for one motion to recommit.
01/30/2017 House Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
01/30/2017 House Introduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform01/30/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (2)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (14)

  • Administrative law and regulatory procedures
  • Age discrimination
  • Congressional oversight
  • Department of Defense
  • Employee leave
  • Employment discrimination and employee rights
  • General Services Administration
  • Labor standards
  • Labor-management relations
  • Military procurement, research, weapons development
  • National Aeronautics and Space Administration
  • Public contracts and procurement
  • Worker safety and health

Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.J.Res.37. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-11 (03/27/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

This joint resolution nullifies the rule finalized by the Department of Defense, the General Services Administration, and the National Aeronautics and Space Administration (NASA) on August 25, 2016, relating to revising the Federal Acquisition Regulation to implement Executive Order 13673 concerning contractor compliance with labor laws.