There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Disapproving the rule submitted by the Department of the Interior known as the Stream Protection Rule.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
02/16/2017Became Public Law No: 115-5. (TXT | PDF)
02/16/2017Signed by President.
02/06/2017Presented to President.
02/02/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 54 - 45. Record Vote Number: 43.
02/01/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 228 - 194 (Roll no. 73).(text: CR H840)
01/30/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber
02/16/2017Became Public Law No: 115-5. (TXT | PDF)
02/16/2017Signed by President.
02/06/2017HousePresented to President.
02/02/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
02/02/2017SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 54 - 45. Record Vote Number: 43.
02/02/2017SenateConsidered by Senate. (consideration: CR S611-632)
02/01/2017SenateMeasure laid before Senate by motion. (consideration: CR S562-574)
02/01/2017SenateMotion to proceed to consideration of measure agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 56 - 42. Record Vote Number: 42. (consideration: CR S561-562)
02/01/2017SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
02/01/2017-4:51pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/01/2017-4:51pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 228 - 194 (Roll no. 73). (text: CR H840)
02/01/2017-4:44pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H859)
02/01/2017-3:07pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.J.Res. 38, the Chair put the question on passage and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Grijalva demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on passage until a time to be announced.
02/01/2017-3:07pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H848)
02/01/2017-1:55pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.J. Res. 38.
02/01/2017-1:55pmHouseRule provides for consideration of H.J. Res. 38 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit.
02/01/2017-1:55pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 70. (consideration: CR H840-848)
01/31/2017-5:26pmHouseRule H. Res. 70 passed House.
01/30/2017-6:39pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 70 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.J. Res. 38 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit.
01/30/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
01/30/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (71)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jenkins, Evan H. [R-WV-3]* 01/30/2017
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Higgins, Clay [R-LA-3]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 01/30/2017
Rep. LaHood, Darin [R-IL-18]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2]* 01/30/2017
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 01/30/2017
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Comer, James [R-KY-1]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Hollingsworth, Trey [R-IN-9]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Radewagen, Aumua Amata Coleman [R-AS-At Large]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Cheney, Liz [R-WY-At Large]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 02/01/2017
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 02/01/2017
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 02/01/2017
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 02/01/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources01/30/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (12)

  • Administrative law and regulatory procedures
  • Coal
  • Congressional oversight
  • Department of the Interior
  • Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
  • Environmental regulatory procedures
  • Hydrology and hydrography
  • Lakes and rivers
  • Licensing and registrations
  • Mining
  • Water quality

Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.J.Res.38. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-5 (02/16/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

This joint resolution nullifies the Stream Protection Rule finalized by the Department of the Interior's Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement on December 20, 2016. The rule addresses the impacts of surface coal mining operations on surface water, groundwater, and the productivity of mining operation sites.