There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of a rule submitted by the Securities and Exchange Commission relating to "Disclosure of Payments by Resource Extraction Issuers".


Actions Overview (6)

Date
02/14/2017 Became Public Law No: 115-4. (TXT | PDF)
02/14/2017 Signed by President.
02/06/2017 Presented to President.
02/03/2017 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 52 - 47. Record Vote Number: 51.
02/01/2017 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 235 - 187 (Roll no. 72).(text: CR H848)
01/30/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
02/14/2017 Became Public Law No: 115-4. (TXT | PDF)
02/14/2017 Signed by President.
02/06/2017 House Presented to President.
02/03/2017 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
02/03/2017 Senate Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 52 - 47. Record Vote Number: 51.
02/03/2017 Senate Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S663-664)
02/02/2017 Senate Measure laid before Senate by motion. (consideration: CR S634-653)
02/02/2017 Senate Motion to proceed to consideration of measure agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 52 - 48. Record Vote Number: 50. (consideration: CR S634)
02/01/2017 Senate Received in the Senate, read twice.
02/01/2017-4:43pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/01/2017-4:43pm House On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 235 - 187 (Roll no. 72). (text: CR H848)
02/01/2017-4:19pm House The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H858)
02/01/2017-3:09pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.J. Res. 41.
02/01/2017-3:08pm House Rule provides for consideration of H.J. Res. 41 and H.J. Res. 40. The resolution provides for one hour of general debate on both H.J.Res. 40 and H.J.Res. 41. All points of order against consideration are waived for both joint resolutions.
02/01/2017-3:08pm House Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 71. (consideration: CR H848-859)
01/30/2017-7:10pm House Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 71 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.J. Res. 41 and H.J. Res. 40. The resolution provides for one hour of general debate on both H.J.Res. 40 and H.J.Res. 41. All points of order against consideration are waived for both joint resolutions.
01/30/2017 House Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
01/30/2017 House Introduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services01/30/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (2)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (9)

  • Administrative law and regulatory procedures
  • Business records
  • Congressional oversight
  • Government information and archives
  • Mining
  • Oil and gas
  • Securities
  • Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC)

Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.J.Res.41. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-4 (02/14/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

This joint resolution nullifies the "Disclosure of Payments by Resource Extraction Issuers" rule finalized by the Securities and Exchange Commission on July 27, 2016. (The rule, mandated under the Dodd-Frank Wall Street Reform and Consumer Protection Act, requires resource extraction issuers to disclose payments made to governments for the commercial development of oil, natural gas, or minerals.)