There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the United States providing that the rights extended by the Constitution are the rights of natural persons only.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/30/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
02/08/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/30/2017 Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/30/2017 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (51)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/30/2017
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/30/2017
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 02/01/2017
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 02/01/2017
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 02/06/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/06/2017
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 02/28/2017
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/28/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 03/01/2017
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 03/10/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 03/15/2017
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 03/15/2017
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/23/2017
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/23/2017
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 04/04/2017
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/04/2017
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/06/2017
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 04/25/2017
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 05/02/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 05/18/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/18/2017
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/22/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/07/2017
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 06/15/2017
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/21/2017
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/12/2017
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 09/21/2017
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 09/21/2017
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 09/21/2017
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 09/27/2017
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 10/02/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 10/04/2017
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 12/11/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/30/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution and Civil Justice02/08/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (0)

As of 12/12/2017 no related bill information has been received for H.J.Res.48 - Proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the United States providing that the rights extended by the Constitution are the rights of natural persons only..

Subjects (6)

  • Constitution and constitutional amendments
  • Corporate finance and management
  • Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
  • First Amendment rights
  • Political advertising

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.J.Res.48. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/30/2017)

Constitutional Amendment

This joint resolution proposes a constitutional amendment providing that: (1) the rights protected by the Constitution are the rights of natural persons only; (2) artificial entities (such as corporations, limited liability companies, and other entities established by the laws of any state, the United States, or any foreign state) shall have no rights under the Constitution and are subject to regulation by the people, through federal, state, or local law; and (3) the privileges of such artificial entities shall not be construed to be inherent or inalienable.

The amendment requires federal, state, and local government to: (1) regulate, limit, or prohibit contributions and expenditures, including a candidate's own contributions and expenditures, to ensure that all citizens, regardless of their economic status, have access to the political process and that no person gains, as a result of that person's money, substantially more access or ability to influence the election of any candidate for public office or any ballot measure; and (2) require that any permissible contributions and expenditures be publicly disclosed. The judiciary is prohibited from construing the spending of money to influence elections to be speech under the First Amendment.