There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Jump to: Summary | Actions Overview | All Actions | Titles | Subjects | Cosponsors | Committees | Related Bills

Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.J.Res.53. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/31/2017)

This joint resolution eliminates the time limit for ratification of the equal rights amendment (prohibits discrimination on account of sex) proposed to the states in House Joint Resolution 208 of the 92nd Congress, as agreed to in the Senate on March 22, 1972. The amendment shall be part of the Constitution whenever ratified by the legislatures of three-fourths of the states.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/31/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
02/08/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Action By: House Judiciary
01/31/2017 Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/31/2017 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Titles (1)

Official Titles:

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced:

Removing the deadline for the ratification of the equal rights amendment.


Subjects (5)

  • Constitution and constitutional amendments
  • Due process and equal protection
  • Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
  • Women's rights

Cosponsors (148)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/31/2017
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/31/2017
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6]* 01/31/2017
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/31/2017
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 01/31/2017
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 01/31/2017
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 01/31/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Kihuen, Ruben [D-NV-4]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 02/02/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 02/02/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 02/02/2017
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 02/02/2017
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/02/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 02/06/2017
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 02/07/2017
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21] 02/07/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/07/2017
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 02/13/2017
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3] 02/13/2017
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 02/13/2017
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 03/20/2017
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 03/22/2017
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 03/28/2017
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 03/28/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/31/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution and Civil Justice02/08/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.