There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Department of Education relating to teacher preparation issues.


Actions Overview (6)

Date Actions Overview
03/27/2017Became Public Law No: 115-14. (TXT | PDF)
03/27/2017Signed by President.
03/16/2017Presented to President.
03/08/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 59 - 40. Record Vote Number: 83.
02/07/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 240 - 181 (Roll no. 85).(text: CR H1041)
02/01/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber All Actions
03/27/2017Became Public Law No: 115-14. (TXT | PDF)
03/27/2017Signed by President.
03/16/2017HousePresented to President.
03/09/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/08/2017SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 59 - 40. Record Vote Number: 83.
03/08/2017SenateConsidered by Senate. (consideration: CR S1651, S1663-1666)
03/07/2017SenateMeasure laid before Senate by motion. (consideration: CR S1625-1627)
03/07/2017SenateMotion to proceed to consideration of measure agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (CR S1625)
02/08/2017SenateReceived in the Senate.
02/07/2017-5:11pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/07/2017-5:11pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 240 - 181 (Roll no. 85). (text: CR H1041)
02/07/2017-5:04pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1056-1057)
02/07/2017-3:33pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.J. Res. 58, the Chair put the question on passage and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mrs. Davis(CA) demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on passage until a time to be announced.
02/07/2017-3:32pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
02/07/2017-2:50pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.J. Res. 58.
02/07/2017-2:50pmHouseRule provides for consideration of H.J. Res. 44, H.J. Res. 57 and H.J. Res. 58. The resolution provides for one hour of debate on each joint resolution. Each joint resolution is closed to amendments and allowed one motion to recommit.
02/07/2017-2:50pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 91. (consideration: CR H1041-1046)
02/07/2017-1:44pmHouseRule H. Res. 91 passed House.
02/06/2017-6:39pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 91 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.J. Res. 44, H.J. Res. 57 and H.J. Res. 58. The resolution provides for one hour of debate on each joint resolution. Each joint resolution is closed to amendments and allowed one motion to recommit.
02/01/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
02/01/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (13)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce02/01/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.J.Res.58. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-14 (03/27/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

This joint resolution nullifies the "Teacher Preparation Issues" rule finalized by the Department of Education on October 31, 2016. The rule implements requirements related to assessing the quality of teacher preparation programs under title II (Teacher Quality Enhancement) of the Higher Education Act of 1965.