There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Disapproving the rule submitted by the Department of Labor relating to savings arrangements established by States for non-governmental employees.


Actions Overview (6)

Date Actions Overview
05/17/2017Became Public Law No: 115-35. (TXT | PDF)
05/17/2017Signed by President.
05/05/2017Presented to President.
05/03/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 50 - 49. Record Vote Number: 120.
02/15/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 231 - 193 (Roll no. 96).(text: CR H1206)
02/07/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber All Actions
05/17/2017Became Public Law No: 115-35. (TXT | PDF)
05/17/2017Signed by President.
05/05/2017HousePresented to President.
05/04/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/03/2017SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 50 - 49. Record Vote Number: 120.
05/03/2017SenateMeasure laid before Senate by motion. (consideration: CR S2692-2715)
05/03/2017SenateMotion to proceed to consideration of measure agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 51 - 48. Record Vote Number: 119. (CR S2692)
02/16/2017SenateReceived in the Senate.
02/15/2017-5:03pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/15/2017-5:03pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 231 - 193 (Roll no. 96). (text: CR H1206)
02/15/2017-4:54pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1221-1222)
02/15/2017-3:23pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.J. Res. 66, the Chair put the question on passage and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Ms. Bonamici demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on passage until a time to be announced.
02/15/2017-3:23pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
02/15/2017-2:17pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.J. Res. 66.
02/15/2017-2:17pmHouseRule provides for consideration of H.J. Res. 66 and H.J. Res. 67. Each joint resolution shall be considered as read. All points of order against provisions in each joint resolution are waived. The previous question shall be considered as ordered on each joint resolution without intervening motion except one hour of debate and one motion to recommit.
02/15/2017-2:17pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 116. (consideration: CR H1206-1217)
02/13/2017-6:43pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 116 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.J. Res. 66 and H.J. Res. 67. Each joint resolution shall be considered as read. All points of order against provisions in each joint resolution are waived. The previous question shall be considered as ordered on each joint resolution without intervening motion except one hour of debate and one motion to recommit.
02/07/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
02/07/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rooney, Francis [R-FL-19]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/13/2017
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/13/2017
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 02/15/2017
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/15/2017
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 02/15/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Education and the Workforce02/07/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.J.Res.66. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-35 (05/17/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

This joint resolution nullifies a rule submitted by the Department of Labor's Employee Benefits Security Administration regarding savings arrangements established by states for non-governmental employees.

(The rule describes circumstances in which state payroll deduction savings programs with automatic enrollment would not give rise to the establishment of employee pension benefit plans under the Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 [ERISA]. It provides guidance to states designing the programs to reduce the risk of ERISA preemption of state laws and private-sector employers that may be covered by the state laws.)