There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Jump to: Summary | Actions Overview | All Actions | Titles | Subjects | Cosponsors | Committees | Related Bills

Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.J.Res.67. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (02/15/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

This joint resolution nullifies a rule submitted by the Department of Labor's Employee Benefits Security Administration regarding savings arrangements established by qualified state political subdivisions for non-governmental employees.

(The rule amends a final regulation that describes how states may design and operate payroll deduction savings programs for private-sector employees, including programs that use automatic enrollment, without causing the states or private-sector employers to have established employee pension benefit plans under the Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 [ERISA]. The amendment expands the regulation beyond states to cover qualified state political subdivisions and their programs that otherwise comply with the regulation.)


Actions Overview (2)

Date
02/15/2017 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 234 - 191 (Roll no. 95).
02/07/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
02/16/2017 Senate Received in the Senate.
02/15/2017-4:54pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/15/2017-4:54pm House On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 234 - 191 (Roll no. 95). (text: CR H1218)
02/15/2017-4:31pm House Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1221)
02/15/2017-3:54pm House POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.J. Res. 67, the Chair put the question on passage and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Ms. Bonamici demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on passage until a time to be announced.
02/15/2017-3:53pm House The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
02/15/2017-3:24pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.J. Res. 67.
02/15/2017-3:24pm House Rule provides for consideration of H.J. Res. 66 and H.J. Res. 67. Each joint resolution shall be considered as read. All points of order against provisions in each joint resolution are waived. The previous question shall be considered as ordered on each joint resolution without intervening motion except one hour of debate and one motion to recommit.
02/15/2017-3:24pm House Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 116. (consideration: CR H1218-1221))
02/14/2017-3:01pm House Rule H. Res. 116 passed House.
02/13/2017-6:43pm House Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 116 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.J. Res. 66 and H.J. Res. 67. Each joint resolution shall be considered as read. All points of order against provisions in each joint resolution are waived. The previous question shall be considered as ordered on each joint resolution without intervening motion except one hour of debate and one motion to recommit.
02/07/2017 House Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
02/07/2017 House Introduced in House

Titles (1)

Official Titles:

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced:

Disapproving the rule submitted by the Department of Labor relating to savings arrangements established by qualified State political subdivisions for non-governmental employees.


Subjects (6)

  • Administrative law and regulatory procedures
  • Congressional oversight
  • Department of Labor
  • Employee benefits and pensions
  • State and local government operations

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 02/07/2017
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/13/2017
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/13/2017
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 02/15/2017
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/15/2017
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 02/15/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce02/07/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (3)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.