There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Jump to: Summary | Actions Overview | All Actions | Titles | Subjects | Cosponsors | Committees | Related Bills

Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.J.Res.69. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-20 (04/03/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

This joint resolution nullifies the rule finalized by the Department of the Interior on August 5, 2016, relating to non-subsistence takings of wildlife and public participation and closure procedures on National Wildlife Refuges in Alaska.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
04/03/2017 Became Public Law No: 115-20.
04/03/2017 Signed by President.
03/27/2017 Presented to President.
03/21/2017 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 52 - 47. Record Vote Number: 92.
02/16/2017 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 225 - 193 (Roll no. 98).(text: CR H1260)
02/07/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber
04/03/2017 Became Public Law No: 115-20.
04/03/2017 Signed by President.
03/27/2017 House Presented to President.
03/22/2017 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
03/21/2017 Senate Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 52 - 47. Record Vote Number: 92.
03/21/2017 Senate Measure laid before Senate by motion. (consideration: CR S1864-1884)
03/21/2017 Senate Motion to proceed to consideration of measure agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S1864)
02/17/2017 Senate Received in the Senate, read twice.
02/16/2017-3:17pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/16/2017-3:17pm House On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 225 - 193 (Roll no. 98). (text: CR H1260)
02/16/2017-2:54pm House Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1278-1279)
02/16/2017-1:41pm House POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.J. Res. 69, the Chair put the question on passage and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Beyer demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on passage until a time to be announced.
02/16/2017-1:40pm House The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
02/16/2017-12:38pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.J. Res. 69.
02/16/2017-12:37pm House The resolution provides for one hour of general debate on both H.J.Res. 43 and H.J.Res. 69; and provides for proceedings during the period from February 17, 2017, through February 24, 2017.
02/16/2017-12:37pm House Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 123. (consideration: CR H1259-1268)
02/15/2017-1:26pm House Rule H. Res. 123 passed House.
02/14/2017-4:46pm House Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 123 Reported to House. The resolution provides for one hour of general debate on both H.J.Res. 43 and H.J.Res. 69; and provides for proceedings during the period from February 17, 2017, through February 24, 2017.
02/07/2017 House Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
02/07/2017 House Introduced in House

Titles (1)

Official Titles:

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced:

Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the final rule of the Department of the Interior relating to "Non-Subsistence Take of Wildlife, and Public Participation and Closure Procedures, on National Wildlife Refuges in Alaska".


Subjects (8)

  • Administrative law and regulatory procedures
  • Alaska
  • Congressional oversight
  • Department of the Interior
  • Hunting and fishing
  • Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
  • Wildlife conservation and habitat protection

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/13/2017
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 02/13/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources02/07/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (4)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.