There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

Granting the consent and approval of Congress for the Commonwealth of Virginia, the State of Maryland, and the District of Columbia to enter into a compact relating to the establishment of the Washington Metrorail Safety Commission.

Official Title as Introduced

Granting the consent and approval of Congress for the Commonwealth of Virginia, the State of Maryland, and the District of Columbia to a enter into a compact relating to the establishment of the Washington Metrorail Safety Commission.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
08/22/2017Became Public Law No: 115-54. (TXT | PDF)
08/22/2017Signed by President.
08/11/2017Presented to President.
08/04/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Received in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR 8/3/2017 S4806)
07/17/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 399 - 5 (Roll no. 381).(text: CR H5894-5897)
07/17/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 115-227.
02/16/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (25)

Date Chamber
08/22/2017Became Public Law No: 115-54. (TXT | PDF)
08/22/2017Signed by President.
08/11/2017HousePresented to President.
08/04/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/04/2017SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR 8/3/2017 S4806)
08/04/2017-1:08pmHouseENGROSSMENT CORRECTION - Unanimous consent was granted for the Clerk to make changes in the engrossment of H.J.Res. 76 that was placed at the desk. Agreed to without objection.
08/01/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/01/2017SenateSenate returned papers to House, per House request of July 24, 2017, by Unanimous Consent.
07/24/2017-6:31pmHouseHouse requested return of papers pursuant to H.Res. 469.
07/18/2017SenateReceived in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 176.
07/17/2017-7:10pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
07/17/2017-7:10pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 399 - 5 (Roll no. 381). (text: CR H5894-5897)
07/17/2017-7:04pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5902-5903)
07/17/2017-5:39pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
07/17/2017-5:14pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.J. Res. 76.
07/17/2017-5:14pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5894-5900)
07/17/2017-5:13pmHouseMr. Goodlatte moved to suspend the rules and pass the resolution, as amended.
07/17/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 162.
07/17/2017HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 115-227.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/14/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/14/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/14/2017HouseSubcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law Discharged.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/09/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/16/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
02/16/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary02/16/2017 Referred to
06/14/2017 Markup by
07/17/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-227
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law03/09/2017 Referred to
06/14/2017 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.J.Res.76. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-54 (08/22/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on July 17, 2017. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Interstate Compact

(Sec. 1) This joint resolution grants congressional consent and approval for the Commonwealth of Virginia, the state of Maryland, and the District of Columbia to enter into a Metrorail Safety Commission (MSC) Interstate Compact.

The MSC Compact establishes a Washington Metrorail Safety Commission for the safety oversight of the Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority (WMATA) Rail (Metrorail) system.

The commission shall:

  • distribute a written State Safety Oversight Program;
  • enforce implementation of WMATA's Public Transportation Agency Safety Plan, as well as audit triennially WMATA's compliance with such plan;
  • enforce implementation of any Corrective Action Plans;
  • enforce relevant federal and state laws and regulations relating to Metrorail safety;
  • publish annually a Metrorail safety report, including updates of Corrective Action Plans, Commission directives, and on-going investigations; and
  • publish annually a report on commission operations.

An independent annual audit shall be made of commission financial accounts.

Any signatory may withdraw from the MSC Compact, which shall constitute its termination.