There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Disapproving the rule submitted by the Department of Labor relating to "Clarification of Employer's Continuing Obligation to Make and Maintain an Accurate Record of Each Recordable Injury and Illness".


Actions Overview (6)

Date Actions Overview
04/03/2017Became Public Law No: 115-21. (TXT | PDF)
04/03/2017Signed by President.
03/27/2017Presented to President.
03/22/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 50 - 48. Record Vote Number: 93.
03/01/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 231 - 191 (Roll no. 121).(text: CR H1421)
02/21/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber All Actions
04/03/2017Became Public Law No: 115-21. (TXT | PDF)
04/03/2017Signed by President.
03/27/2017HousePresented to President.
03/23/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/22/2017SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 50 - 48. Record Vote Number: 93.
03/22/2017SenateMeasure laid before Senate by motion. (consideration: CR S1900-1924)
03/22/2017SenateMotion to proceed to consideration of measure agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S1900)
03/02/2017SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
03/01/2017-6:26pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/01/2017-6:26pmHouseOn passage Passed by recorded vote: 231 - 191 (Roll no. 121). (text: CR H1421)
03/01/2017-6:19pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1447)
03/01/2017-4:03pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.J. Res. 83, the Chair put the question on passage and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Scott (VA) demanded a recorded vote and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of passage until a time to be announced.
03/01/2017-4:03pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
03/01/2017-3:22pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.J. Res. 83.
03/01/2017-3:22pmHouseProvides for consideration of H.R. 998 and H.J.Res. 83.
03/01/2017-3:22pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 150. (consideration: CR H1421-1430)
02/28/2017-2:19pmHouseRule H. Res. 150 passed House.
02/27/2017-7:45pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 150 Reported to House. Provides for consideration of H.R. 998 and H.J.Res. 83.
02/21/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
02/21/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (11)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Education and the Workforce02/21/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.J.Res.83. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-21 (04/03/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

This joint resolution nullifies the Department of Labor's rule that was published on December 19, 2016, about employers' ongoing obligation to make and maintain records of work-related injuries and illnesses.