Text: H.J.Res.99 — 115th Congress (2017-2018)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-30 (04/28/2017)

 
[115th Congress Public Law 30]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office]



[[Page 131 STAT. 134]]

Public Law 115-30
115th Congress

                            Joint Resolution


 
 Making further continuing appropriations for fiscal year 2017, and for 
       other purposes. <<NOTE: Apr. 28, 2017 -  [H.J. Res. 99]>> 

    Resolved by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United 
States of America in Congress assembled, That the Continuing 
Appropriations Act, 2017 (division C of Public Law 114-223) is further 
amended by--
            (1) <<NOTE: Ante, p. 910.>>  striking the date specified in 
        section 106(3) and inserting ``May 5, 2017''; and
            (2) inserting after section 201 the following new section:

    ``Sec. 202. (a) <<NOTE: 30 USC 1201 note.>>  This section may be 
cited as the `Further Continued Health Benefits for Miners Act'.

    ``(b) Section 402(h)(2)(C)(ii) of the Surface Mining Control and 
Reclamation Act of 1977 (30 U.S.C. 1232(h)(2)(C)(ii)) is amended--
            ``(1) in subclause (II), by striking `April 30, 2017' and 
        inserting `May 5, 2017';
            ``(2) in subclause (II)(aa), by striking `the Continued 
        Health Benefits for Miners Act' and inserting `the Further 
        Continued Health Benefits for Miners Act'; and
            ``(3) by adding at the end the following: `For purposes of 
        subclause (II)(aa), a beneficiary enrolled in the Plan as of the 
        date of the enactment of the Further Continued Health Benefits 
        for Miners Act shall be deemed to have been eligible to receive 
        health benefits under the Plan on January 1, 2017.'.

    ``(c) <<NOTE: Applicability.>>  The provisions of section 167(d) of 
Public Law 114-223 (as added by Public Law 114-254) shall apply to this 
section.''.

    Approved April 28, 2017.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--H.J. Res. 99:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 163 (2017):
            Apr. 28, considered and passed House and Senate.

                                  <all>