There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Waiving a requirement of clause 6(a) of rule XIII with respect to consideration of certain resolutions reported from the Committee on Rules, and providing for consideration of motions to suspend the rules.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
07/24/2018The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 115-873, by Mr. Sessions.
07/24/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
07/26/2018-10:27amPursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 1027, H. Res. 1020 is laid on the table.
07/24/2018Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 175.
07/24/2018-9:35pmThe resolution waives a requirement of clause 6(a) of rule XIII with respect to consideration of certain resolutions reported from the Committee on Rules, and provides for consideration of motions to suspend the rules.
07/24/2018The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 115-873, by Mr. Sessions.

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Rules07/24/2018 Reported original measure H. Rept. 115-873

No related bill information was received for H.Res.1020.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.1020. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/24/2018)

Waives a specified requirement of Rule XIII (Calendar and Committee Reports) to allow consideration of any resolution reported from the Committee on Rules through the legislative day of July 27, 2018 (relating to a measure authorizing appropriations for the Department of Defense), on the same day it is presented to the House.

Makes it in order at any time on the legislative day of July 26, 2018, or July 27, 2018, for the Speaker of the House to suspend the rules as though under Rule XV (Business in Order on Special Days), relating to such a measure.

Authorizes the Committee on Appropriations at any time before 3 p.m. on Thursday, August 2, 2018, to file privileged reports to accompany measures making appropriations for FY2019.