There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Condemning Iranian state-sponsored terrorism and expressing support for the Iranian people's desire for a democratic, secular, and non-nuclear republic of Iran.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/26/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
07/26/2018Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
07/26/2018Introduced in House

Cosponsors (104)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 07/27/2018
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 07/27/2018
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 08/03/2018
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 08/03/2018
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 08/10/2018
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 08/14/2018
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 08/14/2018
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 08/14/2018
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 08/14/2018
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 08/31/2018
Rep. Faso, John J. [R-NY-19] 08/31/2018
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 08/31/2018
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 08/31/2018
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 08/31/2018
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 08/31/2018
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 08/31/2018
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 08/31/2018
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 08/31/2018
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 08/31/2018
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 08/31/2018
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6] 08/31/2018
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 08/31/2018
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 08/31/2018
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 08/31/2018
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 09/06/2018
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 09/06/2018
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 09/06/2018
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11] 09/06/2018
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/06/2018
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 09/06/2018
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 09/06/2018
Rep. Cheney, Liz [R-WY-At Large] 09/06/2018
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/06/2018
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/06/2018
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 09/06/2018
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 09/06/2018
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/06/2018
Rep. Walters, Mimi [R-CA-45] 09/06/2018
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 09/06/2018
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 09/06/2018
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 09/06/2018
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/06/2018
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/06/2018
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 09/13/2018
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/13/2018
Rep. Rooney, Francis [R-FL-19] 09/13/2018
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 09/13/2018
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 09/13/2018
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 09/13/2018
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 09/13/2018
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 09/13/2018
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 09/13/2018
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 09/13/2018
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 09/13/2018
Rep. Garrett, Thomas A., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/13/2018
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 09/13/2018
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 09/27/2018
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/27/2018
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 09/27/2018
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1] 09/27/2018
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 09/27/2018
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 09/27/2018
Rep. Lewis, Jason [R-MN-2] 09/27/2018
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8] 09/27/2018
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/05/2018
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 10/05/2018
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 10/05/2018
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 10/05/2018
Rep. Trott, David A. [R-MI-11] 10/05/2018
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/12/2018
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 10/12/2018
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 10/12/2018
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 10/12/2018
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 10/12/2018
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 10/26/2018
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/26/2018
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 10/26/2018
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 10/26/2018
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 10/26/2018
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5] 11/16/2018
Resident Commissioner Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large] 11/16/2018
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 11/16/2018
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 11/16/2018
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 11/16/2018
Rep. Handel, Karen C. [R-GA-6] 11/16/2018
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 11/16/2018
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-11] 11/16/2018
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 11/16/2018
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 11/16/2018
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 11/16/2018
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 11/27/2018
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4] 11/27/2018
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 12/10/2018
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 12/10/2018
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 12/10/2018
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 12/10/2018
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 12/10/2018
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 12/11/2018
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23] 12/11/2018
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 12/11/2018
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 12/11/2018
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 12/31/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Foreign Affairs07/26/2018 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.1034.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.1034. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/26/2018)

Condemns Iranian state-sponsored terrorist attacks against U.S. citizens and officials and Iranian dissidents.

Expresses support for the people of Iran who are engaged in legitimate and peaceful protests against the Iranian regime.