Text: H.Res.1034 — 115th Congress (2017-2018)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/26/2018)

 
[Congressional Bills 115th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office]
[H. Res. 1034 Introduced in House (IH)]

<DOC>






115th CONGRESS
  2d Session
H. RES. 1034

Condemning Iranian state-sponsored terrorism and expressing support for 
the Iranian people's desire for a democratic, secular, and non-nuclear 
                           republic of Iran.


_______________________________________________________________________


                    IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

                             July 26, 2018

Mr. McClintock (for himself, Mr. Gosar, and Mr. Poe of Texas) submitted 
   the following resolution; which was referred to the Committee on 
                            Foreign Affairs

_______________________________________________________________________

                               RESOLUTION


 
Condemning Iranian state-sponsored terrorism and expressing support for 
the Iranian people's desire for a democratic, secular, and non-nuclear 
                           republic of Iran.

Whereas, on July 2, 2018, the Belgium Federal Prosecutor's Office announced the 
        foiling of a terrorist plot against the ``Free Iran 2018 - the 
        Alternative'' gathering held on June 30, 2018, in support of the Iranian 
        people's quest for freedom;
Whereas the Free Iran gathering had commenced to show support for the Iranian 
        opposition leader Mrs. Maryam Rajavi's 10-point plan for future Iran, 
        that calls for universal right to vote, free elections, and advocates 
        gender, religious and ethnic equality, and adheres to a market economy;
Whereas the plan calls for establishment of a republic in Iran based on 
        separation of religion and state and envisions a non-nuclear Iran;
Whereas the plan commits to the abolition of Sharia Law, practiced by the 
        Iranian regime, and a foreign policy based on peaceful coexistence and 
        international and regional peace and cooperation, as well as respect for 
        the United Nations Charter;
Whereas senior governmental, military, and public security officials in Iran 
        have for decades ordered or committed egregious human rights violations 
        and acts of terror;
Whereas a senior Iranian diplomat based in the Iranian embassy in Vienna, 
        Austria, was also arrested in connection with the planned terror plot 
        while in Germany;
Whereas the Iranian diplomat has been charged in Belgium in connection with the 
        terrorist plot and in Germany with ``activity as a foreign agent and 
        conspiracy to commit murder'';
Whereas a senior Department of State official said on July 10, 2018, that ``Iran 
        uses embassies as cover to plot terrorist attacks.'', and that ``The 
        most recent example is the plot that the Belgians foiled, and we had an 
        Iranian diplomat out of the Austrian embassy as part of the plot to bomb 
        a meeting of Iranian opposition leaders in Paris.'';
Whereas the Department of State official has urged ``all nations to be vigilant 
        about Iran using embassies as diplomatic cover to plot terrorist 
        attacks'';
Whereas Secretary of State Mike Pompeo expressed concern about Iran's use of its 
        embassies to plan terrorist activities in Europe, including the ``plot 
        to bomb an Iranian opposition group rally in France on June 30, 2018'';
Whereas several prominent former United States Government officials, three 
        retired United States generals, congressional staff, and thousands of 
        United States citizens participated at this gathering; and
Whereas a large bipartisan group of Members of Congress supported H.R. 4744, and 
        have expressed support for ``efforts made by the people of Iran to 
        promote the establishment of basic freedoms that build the foundation 
        for the emergence of a freely elected, open, non-corrupt and democratic 
        political system'': Now, therefore, be it
    Resolved, That the House of Representatives--
            (1) condemns past and present Iranian state-sponsored 
        terrorist attacks against United States citizens, United States 
        officials, and Iranian dissidents;
            (2) condemns the Iranian regime's terror plot against 
        United States citizens and other participants of the ``Free 
        Iran 2018 - the Alternative'' gathering in Paris;
            (3) calls on relevant United States Government agencies to 
        work with European allies to identify and bring to justice the 
        Iranian officials behind this plot;
            (4) stands with the people of Iran who are engaged in 
        continuing, legitimate, and peaceful protests against an 
        oppressive, corrupt regime; and
            (5) recognizes the rights of the Iranian people and their 
        struggle to establish a democratic, secular, and non-nuclear 
        republic of Iran.
                                 <all>

Share This