There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing opposition to the completion of Nord Stream II, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
12/11/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(CR text: H10073)
07/26/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date
12/11/2018-3:51pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/11/2018-3:51pmOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (CR text: H10073)
12/11/2018-3:38pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 1035.
12/11/2018-3:38pmConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10073-10075)
12/11/2018-3:38pmMr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
07/27/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
07/26/2018Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Government Reform, the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/26/2018Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Government Reform, the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/26/2018Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Government Reform, the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/26/2018Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Government Reform, the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/26/2018Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Government Reform, the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/26/2018Introduced in House

Cosponsors (36)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Rooney, Francis [R-FL-19]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Tenney, Claudia [R-NY-22]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Gianforte, Greg [R-MT-At Large]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8]* 07/26/2018
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 09/20/2018
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/25/2018
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 09/25/2018
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 09/26/2018
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 09/26/2018
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 09/26/2018
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 09/26/2018
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 09/26/2018
Rep. Graves, Garret [R-LA-6] 09/26/2018
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/26/2018
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 09/26/2018
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 09/26/2018
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 09/27/2018
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/27/2018
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/27/2018
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 09/28/2018
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 10/02/2018
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 10/05/2018
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 10/05/2018
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 10/05/2018
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 10/12/2018

Committees (5)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs07/26/2018 Referred to
House Financial Services07/26/2018 Referred to
House Oversight and Government07/26/2018 Referred to
House Judiciary07/26/2018 Referred to
House Ways and Means07/26/2018 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade07/27/2018 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.1035.


Subjects (11)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.1035. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/26/2018)

Expresses opposition to the completion of Nord Stream II, the gas pipeline that would transport natural gas from Russia through the Baltic Sea to Germany.

Urges the President to support European energy security through a policy of diversification to lessen reliance on Russia.

Supports the imposition of sanctions with respect to Nord Stream II.