Text: H.Res.1052 — 115th Congress (2017-2018)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Engrossed in House (11/13/2018)


H. Res. 1052



In the House of Representatives, U. S.,

November 13, 2018.  

    Whereas the United States of America and the Commonwealth of Australia are treaty allies;

    Whereas United States and Australia defense cooperation extends back 100 years, to the Battle of Hamel in World War I;

    Whereas the Australia, New Zealand, United States Security Treaty, also referred to as the ANZUS Treaty, has formed the framework of the United States-Australia alliance since 1951;

    Whereas the Australia-United States Ministerial Consultation, also referred to as AUSMIN, has contributed to a deeper partnership between the two nations;

    Whereas the National Aeronautics and Space Administration (NASA) notes that, “The United States and Australia have been cooperating in civil space for more than 50 years”;

    Whereas the United States Apollo missions and subsequent space science and exploration conducted by the United States benefitted greatly from the partnership with our Australian allies;

    Whereas Neil Armstrong’s first steps on the surface of the Moon were relayed to Houston through the Honeysuckle Creek site in Australia;

    Whereas NASA also notes that, “The Canberra complex is an integral component of NASA’s Deep Space Network (DSN), the world’s largest and most sensitive scientific telecommunications system”;

    Whereas the Canberra Deep Space Communication Complex (CDSCC) is one of NASA’s largest tracking and communication facilities outside the United States;

    Whereas, on Tuesday, October 17, 2017, Australian Ambassador to the United States Joe Hockey and Acting NASA Administrator Robert Lightfoot signed a 25-year agreement for continued cooperation on space cooperation, including on space tracking;

    Whereas the United States and Australian governments have jointly committed to expanding Space Situational Awareness (SSA);

    Whereas United States-Australia cooperation on SSA is critical to maximize defense capabilities, monitoring environmental changes, avoiding space congestion and collisions, and protecting against exploitation from the growing counter-space capabilities of our adversaries;

    Whereas, on September 24, 2017, the Government of Australia under Prime Minister Malcolm Turnbull committed to creating the Australian Space Agency, with operations beginning on July 1, 2018; and

    Whereas the Australian Space Agency commenced operations on July 1, 2018: Now, therefore, be it

Resolved, That the House of Representatives—

(1) commends the Australian Government in constituting the Australian Space Agency;

(2) recognizes the value in United States-Australia cooperation on space research, exploration, and utilization, including on terrestrial research, commercial activities, and human and robotic space exploration;

(3) supports international cooperation on space research, exploration, and utilization and other forms of space diplomacy as being in the national interest of the United States;

(4) encourages the Department of State to support and facilitate international cooperation with Australia on space research, exploration, and utilization through diplomatic efforts, including through the Australia-United States Ministerial Consultations (AUSMIN) forum and multilateral initiatives with Japan, Canada, the European Union, and other partners of both the United States and Australia; and

(5) supports deeper cooperation with our Australian allies in contributing each country’s unique strengths and resources to mutual prosperity and security.

Attest:





Clerk.