There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 3798) to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to repeal the 30-hour threshold for classification as a full-time employee for purposes of the employer mandate in the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act and replace it with 40 hours; providing for consideration of the conference report to accompany the bill (H.R. 5895) making appropriations for energy and water development and related agencies for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2019, and for other purposes; and providing for proceedings during the period from September 17, 2018, through September 24, 2018.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/13/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 222 - 171 (Roll no. 397).(text: CR H8181)
09/12/2018The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 115-949, by Mr. Sessions.
09/12/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
09/13/2018-1:01pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/13/2018-1:01pmOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 222 - 171 (Roll no. 397). (text: CR H8181)
09/13/2018-12:34pmThe previous question was ordered without objection.
09/13/2018-12:27pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 1059.
09/13/2018-12:24pmConsidered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H8181-8184)
09/12/2018Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 183.
09/12/2018-8:15pmProviding for consideration of H.R. 3798 and the conference report to accompany H.R. 5895. Both shall be debatable for one hour and are granted one motion to recommit with or without instructions.
09/12/2018The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 115-949, by Mr. Sessions.

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Rules09/12/2018 Reported original measure H. Rept. 115-949

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.1059. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/12/2018)

Sets forth the rule for consideration of the bill (H.R. 3798) to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to repeal the 30-hour threshold for classification as a full-time employee for purposes of the employer mandate in the Patient Protection and Affordable Act and replace it with 40 hours; providing for consideration of the conference report to accompany the bill (H.R. 5895) making appropriations for energy and water development and related agencies for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2019, and for other purposes; and providing for proceedings during the period from September 17, 2018, through September 24, 2018.