There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Supporting the goals and ideals of October as "National Domestic Violence Awareness Month" and expressing the sense of the House of Representatives that Congress should continue to raise awareness of domestic violence and its devastating effects on individuals, families, and communities, and support programs designed to end domestic violence in the United States.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/28/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
09/28/2018Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
09/28/2018Introduced in House

Cosponsors (62)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 09/28/2018
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 09/28/2018
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 09/28/2018
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 09/28/2018
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 09/28/2018
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 09/28/2018
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 09/28/2018
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 09/28/2018
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 09/28/2018
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4]* 09/28/2018
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 09/28/2018
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 09/28/2018
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 09/28/2018
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 09/28/2018
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 09/28/2018
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 09/28/2018
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14]* 09/28/2018
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 09/28/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 09/28/2018
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12]* 09/28/2018
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 09/28/2018
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 09/28/2018
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 09/28/2018
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 09/28/2018
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 09/28/2018
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 09/28/2018
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 09/28/2018
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 09/28/2018
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10]* 09/28/2018
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 09/28/2018
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2]* 09/28/2018
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 09/28/2018
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 09/28/2018
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 09/28/2018
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 09/28/2018
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5]* 09/28/2018
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 09/28/2018
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 09/28/2018
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 09/28/2018
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 09/28/2018
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 09/28/2018
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 09/28/2018
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 09/28/2018
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 09/28/2018
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 09/28/2018
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 09/28/2018
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 09/28/2018
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 09/28/2018
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 09/28/2018
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 09/28/2018
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 09/28/2018
Rep. Plaskett, Stacey E. [D-VI-At Large]* 09/28/2018
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 09/28/2018
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 10/05/2018
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 10/05/2018
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/05/2018
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/05/2018
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 10/05/2018
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/16/2018
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/16/2018
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 10/26/2018
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 11/14/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce09/28/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.1104. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/28/2018)

Expresses support for the goals and ideals of National Domestic Violence Awareness Month.