There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Remembering the 20th anniversary of Matthew Shepard's death and expressing Congress's continued support for the prevention of hate crimes and the advancement of equality for lesbian, gay, bisexual, transgender, and queer Americans.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
10/12/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
11/15/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
10/12/2018Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
10/12/2018Introduced in House

Cosponsors (99)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 10/12/2018
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 10/12/2018
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 10/12/2018
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 10/12/2018
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 10/12/2018
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 10/12/2018
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8]* 10/12/2018
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Kihuen, Ruben J. [D-NV-4]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 10/12/2018
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 10/16/2018
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/16/2018
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 10/16/2018
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 10/16/2018
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/16/2018
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 10/16/2018
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/16/2018
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 10/16/2018
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 10/16/2018
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 10/19/2018
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 10/19/2018
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 10/23/2018
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 11/13/2018
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 11/20/2018
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 11/27/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary10/12/2018 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations11/15/2018 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.1121.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.1121. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/12/2018)

Finds that no person should face violence or discrimination because of their actual or perceived sexual orientation or gender identity.

Honors the contributions of nonprofit organizations and community leaders working to advance tolerance, acceptance, equality, safety and respect for lesbian, gay, bisexual, transgender, and queer (LGBTQ) Americans.

Reaffirms support for LGBTQ-inclusive hate crime prevention laws.