There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Supporting respect for human rights and encouraging inclusive governance in Ethiopia.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
04/10/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H3069-3070)
02/15/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date
04/10/2018-5:43pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/10/2018-5:43pmOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3069-3070)
04/10/2018-5:13pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 128.
04/10/2018-5:13pmConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3069-3075)
04/10/2018-5:13pmMr. Smith (NJ) moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
07/27/2017Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
07/27/2017Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/18/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights and International Organizations.
02/15/2017Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
02/15/2017Introduced in House

Cosponsors (114)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 02/15/2017
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 02/15/2017
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 02/15/2017
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 02/15/2017
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/15/2017
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/07/2017
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/07/2017
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 03/07/2017
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 03/07/2017
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/22/2017
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 03/22/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/22/2017
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 03/22/2017
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 03/22/2017
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/24/2017
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 03/24/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 03/24/2017
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 03/24/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/24/2017
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 03/24/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 03/24/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 03/24/2017
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 04/17/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/17/2017
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/17/2017
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 04/25/2017
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 05/04/2017
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 05/04/2017
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/04/2017
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 05/04/2017
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/17/2017
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/17/2017
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 06/08/2017
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/08/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 06/08/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/29/2017
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 06/29/2017
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 06/29/2017
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 06/29/2017
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/29/2017
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/29/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2] 06/29/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/29/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/29/2017
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/29/2017
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/29/2017
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 06/29/2017
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/12/2017
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 07/12/2017
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/12/2017
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4] 07/12/2017
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 07/12/2017
Rep. Lewis, Jason [R-MN-2] 07/12/2017
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 07/19/2017
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 07/19/2017
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 07/19/2017
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/27/2017
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/27/2017
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 08/04/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 08/04/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/07/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/07/2017
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 09/07/2017
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 09/07/2017
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 09/27/2017
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 09/27/2017
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/27/2017
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 09/27/2017
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/05/2017
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 10/05/2017
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 10/05/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 11/13/2017
Rep. Blum, Rod [R-IA-1] 11/13/2017
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 01/16/2018
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 01/25/2018
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 01/29/2018
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 02/06/2018
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 02/26/2018
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/26/2018
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/26/2018
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 02/26/2018
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 03/01/2018
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 03/01/2018
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/01/2018
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 03/01/2018
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 03/06/2018
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 03/06/2018
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/06/2018
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 03/08/2018
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 03/08/2018
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/08/2018
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 03/14/2018
Rep. Russell, Steve [R-OK-5] 03/14/2018
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 03/20/2018
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/20/2018
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 03/20/2018
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 03/20/2018
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-2] 03/20/2018
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 03/22/2018
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 04/05/2018
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 04/05/2018
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 04/05/2018
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/05/2018
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/05/2018
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 04/05/2018
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 04/05/2018
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 04/05/2018
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 04/05/2018
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 04/10/2018
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/10/2018
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 04/10/2018
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 04/10/2018
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 04/10/2018
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/10/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs02/15/2017 Referred to
07/27/2017 Markup by
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights and International Organizations05/18/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.128. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (04/10/2018)

Recognizes: (1) Ethiopia's efforts to promote regional peace and security; and (2) the importance of the U.S.-Ethiopian partnership in combatting terrorism, promoting economic growth, and addressing global health challenges.

Condemns the use of excessive force by Ethiopian security forces and notes the reports of widespread human rights abuses.

Commends the recent peaceful and voluntary transfer of authority from Prime Minister Hailemariam to Prime Minister Abiy.

Calls on the government of Ethiopia to: (1) lift the state of emergency and end the use of excessive force by the security forces; (2) release all activists, journalists, and opposition figures who have been imprisoned for exercising their constitutional rights; and (3) allow for an independent human rights examination by a U.N.-appointed rapporteur.

Calls on the Department of State and the U.S. Agency for International Development to strengthen ties with Ethiopia and engage in a cooperative effort to advance democracy, human rights, economic growth, and security.