There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Of inquiry directing the Secretary of the Treasury to provide to the House of Representatives the tax returns and other specified financial information of President Donald J. Trump.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
03/30/2017Reported adversely by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 115-73.
03/09/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
03/30/2017Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 30.
03/30/2017Reported adversely by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 115-73.
03/28/2017Ordered to be Reported Unfavorably by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 16.
03/28/2017Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
03/09/2017Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
03/09/2017Introduced in House

Cosponsors (92)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 03/09/2017
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/09/2017
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 03/09/2017
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1]* 03/09/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 03/09/2017
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 03/09/2017
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 03/09/2017
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 03/09/2017
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 03/09/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/09/2017
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/10/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 03/10/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 03/10/2017
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/10/2017
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/10/2017
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 03/10/2017
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 03/10/2017
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/10/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 03/10/2017
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/10/2017
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 03/10/2017
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/10/2017
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/10/2017
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 03/10/2017
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/10/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/10/2017
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 03/10/2017
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 03/10/2017
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 03/10/2017
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 03/16/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 03/16/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/16/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/16/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 03/16/2017
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 03/16/2017
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/16/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/16/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 03/16/2017
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/16/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 03/16/2017
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 03/16/2017
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 03/16/2017
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 03/16/2017
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 03/16/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 03/16/2017
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 03/16/2017
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/16/2017
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/16/2017
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 03/16/2017
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 03/16/2017
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/16/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 03/16/2017
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 03/16/2017
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/16/2017
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/16/2017
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/16/2017
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 03/16/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 03/20/2017
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 03/20/2017
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/20/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/21/2017
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/23/2017
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 03/27/2017
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/27/2017
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1] 03/27/2017
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 03/27/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 03/27/2017
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 03/27/2017
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 03/27/2017
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 03/27/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 03/27/2017
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 03/27/2017
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 03/27/2017
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 03/27/2017
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 03/27/2017
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 03/27/2017
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/27/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 03/27/2017
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 03/27/2017
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 03/27/2017
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/27/2017
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 03/27/2017
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/27/2017
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 03/27/2017
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/27/2017
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 03/28/2017
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 03/28/2017
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/28/2017
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 03/28/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 03/28/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2] 03/28/2017
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 03/28/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means03/09/2017 Referred to
03/28/2017 Markup by
03/30/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-73

As of 10/22/2018 no related bill information has been received for H.Res.186 - Of inquiry directing the Secretary of the Treasury to provide to the House of Representatives the tax returns and other specified financial information of President Donald J. Trump..


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.186. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House without amendment (03/30/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Directs the Department of the Treasury to provide to the House of Representatives the full tax returns of President Donald J. Trump for tax years 2006-2015, financial documentation, and any information in its possession that specifies President Trump's:

  • debts held by foreign governments and foreign companies;
  • investments in foreign countries and foreign enterprises; and
  • use of any tax shelters, corporate structures, tax avoidance maneuvers, abatements, or other loopholes to reduce or eliminate tax liability.